Frenz v. Waters
Plaintiff: Sharon Frenz
Defendant: Celia Rose Waters
Case Number: 1:2020cv00296
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/14/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 6/30/20. (cmj)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Sharon Frenz by Celia Rose Waters. (Moore, Thomas) Modified on 6/30/2020 (cmj).
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Frenz. (Crowe, A.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sharon Frenz (Crowe, A.)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Order entered 6/16/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 7/20/2020.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/16/20. (cmj)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Celia Rose Waters. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
June 8, 2020 REFERRAL OF #4 Amended Complaint to Judge Steele. (cmj)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Celia Rose Waters, filed by Sharon Frenz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Crowe, A.)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for plaintiff to file such material as she deems appropriate to carry her burden of establishing subject matter jurisdiction, as set out. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 6/15/2020.) Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/2/20. (cmj)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Sharon Frenz (Crowe, A.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celia Rose Waters (Filing fee $400 receipt number 46031053534, Fee Paid at Intake) filed by Sharon Frenz. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Crowe, A.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2020: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (meh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frenz v. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Frenz
Represented By: A. Evans Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celia Rose Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?