James v. Raybon et al
Plaintiff: Joe Nathan James, Jr.
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn and Terry Raybon
Case Number: 1:2020cv00299
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Joe Nathan James, Jr. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice, prior to service of process, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) because it is malicious as set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 07/20/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Payment of Remainder of Prisoner Filing Fee. ADOC to collect payments pursuant to 28:1915(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/24/2020. (srd) Copies to Parties.
June 23, 2020 REFERRAL OF #4 Partial Filing Fee Received to Judge Murray (PSU). (srd)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 Partial Filing fee: $ 7.00, receipt number 46031053714. (srd) Referred to Judge Murray (PSU).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, and directing Plaintiff to REMIT fee in the amount of $7.00 within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/5/2020. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joe Nathan James, Jr. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (srd)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Jefferson S. Dunn, Terry Raybon, filed by Joe Nathan James, Jr. (srd) Referred to Judge Murray (PSU).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Raybon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Nathan James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Raybon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?