Thomas v. Stewart
Plaintiff: Morris Jermaine Thomas
Defendant: Cynthia D. Stewart
Case Number: 1:2020cv00300
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Payment Prisoner Filing Fee. ADOC to collect payments pursuant to 28:1915(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 06/24/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff, ADOC & Business Manager at Donaldson as directed) (nah)
June 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED to PSU for screening. (mpp)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to withhold service until further notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/17/20. (order mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 06/08/2020. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (nah)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Morris Jermaine Thomas - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU). (nah)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Morris Jermaine Thomas - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU). (nah)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Cynthia D. Stewart, filed by Morris Jermaine Thomas - Ref to MJ/Bivins (PSU) (nah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Jermaine Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?