Hare v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Beverly Ruth Hare
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00304
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2021 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Jury Selection set for 1/4/2021 08:45AM. Trial to be set during the month of January 2021 (ETT 3 days). Discovery cutoff 5/26/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2021. Motions due by 6/24/2021. Position Regarding Settlement due by 5/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Scheduling Conference held on 7/21/2020. (eec)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order setting a Scheduling Conference VIA TELEPHONE for 7/21/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/10/2020. (tgw)
July 10, 2020 REFERRAL OF #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Murray. (tgw)
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (DeLashmet, W.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Filing Response to ROGs and RFP filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (DeLashmet, W.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Filing Response to ROGs and RFP filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (DeLashmet, W.)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (DeLashmet, W.)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order STRIKING #8 Notice of Filing Discovery filed by Beverly Ruth Hare. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/11/2020. (nah)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 STRICKEN Notice of Filing Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants filed by Beverly Ruth Hare. (Montgomery, Patrick) Modified on 6/11/2020 (nah).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/09/2020. (nah)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/5/2020. (eec)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, LP for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.. (DeLashmet, W.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2625189, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court File, #3 Exhibit B Pltf Rep to RFA, #4 Exhibit C BCBS Letter) (DeLashmet, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hare v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Ruth Hare
Represented By: Patrick Glenn Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?