Santos et al v. Michelin North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yolanda Santos and Irving Santos
Defendant: Michelin North America, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Sam's East, Inc. and Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00305
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Patrick M. Ardis. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/31/20. (lto)
July 31, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION and APPLICATION for Patrick M. Ardis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (srd)
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION and APPLICATION for Patrick M. Ardis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number CALSDC-2653180, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ardis, Patrick)
July 20, 2020 Set Telelphonic Scheduling Conference for 8/4/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: This cause is before the Court on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, filed July 20, 2020. (Doc. 16). This action shall come on for a Rule 16(b) scheduling conference by telephone on August 4, 2020 at 2:00 p.m., as it is the undersigned's belief that bringing the parties and the Court together at this stage promotes efficiency in the litigation process, helps avoid discovery disputes, provides a clearer path to pretrial resolution, and allows counsel to pose questions to the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(1)(B) (providing that a magistrate judge must issue a scheduling order "after consulting with the parties' attorneys... at a scheduling conference."). Counsel shall attend the scheduling conference by telephone by using the following numbers to call-in for the conference call: CALL IN NO.: 877-873-8018 and ACCESS CODE:3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/20/20. (lto)
July 20, 2020 REFERRAL OF #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Murray. (cmj)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Eagan, Melody)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Steven David Jansma. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/15/20. (lto)
June 15, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION and APPLICATION for Steven D. Jansma to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION and APPLICATION for Steven D. Jansma to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2628748, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc.. (Jansma, Steven)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Theresa Wardon Benz. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/8/20. (lto)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Michael Lawrence O'Donnell. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/8/20. (lto)
June 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION and APPLICATION for Theresa Wardon Benz to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #8 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael L. O'Donnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 Documents endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation, Michelin North America, Inc. (Steele, William)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION and APPLICATION for Theresa Wardon Benz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2625552, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation, Michelin North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing USDC Colo., #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing State of Colo.) (Benz, Theresa)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Defendant Michelin North America, Inc. and the Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Defendants Sam's East, Inc., and Sam's West, Inc. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael L. O'Donnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2625497, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation, Michelin North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USDC Colo. Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit State of Colo. Certificate of Good Standing) (O'Donnell, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/20/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/5/20. (cmj)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc. Consent to Removal (Marchand, Chad)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc.. (Marchand, Chad)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc.. (Marchand, Chad)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation, Michelin North America, Inc.. (Eagan, Melody)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation, Michelin North America, Inc., Michelin North America, Inc., Michelin North America, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Michelin North America, Inc. for Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation, Michelin North America, Inc... (Eagan, Melody)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2625242, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Michelin North America, Inc., Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Eagan, Melody) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2020: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos et al v. Michelin North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin North America, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa Wardon Benz
Represented By: Melody H. Eagan
Represented By: Michael Lawrence O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation
Represented By: Theresa Wardon Benz
Represented By: Melody H. Eagan
Represented By: Michael Lawrence O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Santos
Represented By: John M. Lassiter, Jr.
Represented By: James R. Reeves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Santos
Represented By: John M. Lassiter, Jr.
Represented By: James R. Reeves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?