Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc.
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00312
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Motion to Dismiss #10 filed by Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc. Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. (jil)
June 16, 2020 REFERRAL OF #10 Notice of Dismissal to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Dismissal filed by Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc.. (Taylor, Richard) Modified on 6/16/2020 (cmj).
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #3 , #4 Disclosure Statements filed by Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/11/2020. (ctn)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
June 11, 2020 REFERRAL OF #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Beaverstock. (mbp)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 Case re-assigned to District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 Service Notice entered 6/10/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 7/24/2020. (tot)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc.. (Taylor, Richard)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc.. (Taylor, Richard)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc. for The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Taylor, Richard)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2626941, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc.. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Cincinnati Policy EPP 052 56 21, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Dr. Harris's Order 3.27.2020, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Dr. Harris May 8, 2020 Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Dr. Harris May 21, 2020 Order, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - 5.21.2020 - Cincinnati Denial Letter) (Taylor, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Flames Banquet & Ballroom, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Richard H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?