Tipp v. JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Marian S.A. Tipp
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC. and Chase Home Finance, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00317
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/9/2020. (copy to Pltf) (mab) (Main Document 10 replaced on 7/9/2020) (mab). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2020: #1 consent form) (mab).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #8 Disclosure Statement filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Home Finance, LLC., JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/9/2020. (ctn)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Chase Home Finance, LLC., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC., JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC, JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC, JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC for Chase Home Finance, LLC., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC... (Turner, Michael)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chase Home Finance, LLC., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC.. (Turner, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed: Chase Home Finance, LLC. served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (mab)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (mab)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed: JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC. served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (mab)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration & disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 06/15/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued at Intake as to Chase Home Finance, LLC., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., and JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC. (srd)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment Action to Recover Possession of Property against Chase Home Finance, LLC., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-46031053641, Paid at Intake), filed by Marian S.A. Tipp. (Attachments: #1 Filing fee Receipt) (srd) Referred to Judge Nelson (PSU).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tipp v. JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian S.A. Tipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Sandy G. Robinson
Represented By: Jason Wayne Bobo
Represented By: Michael E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC.
Represented By: Sandy G. Robinson
Represented By: Jason Wayne Bobo
Represented By: Michael E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC.
Represented By: Sandy G. Robinson
Represented By: Jason Wayne Bobo
Represented By: Michael E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?