Neal v. Colonial Trailways, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cleven Neal
Defendant: Colonial Trailways, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00328
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Hardship Loan filed by Cleven Neal. Referred to Judge Dubose (PSU). (meh)
August 13, 2020 REFERRAL OF #12 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Bivins. (tgw)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion #3 to Dismiss filed by Colonial Trailways, Inc.. (Rehm, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 REFERRAL OF #11 Notice of Filing to alert the Court Plaintiff has filed a motion in the Circuit Court of Mobile County to Judge DuBose. (tgw)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Colonial Trailways, Inc. of Filing to alert the Court Plaintiff has filed a motion in the Circuit Court of Mobile County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rehm, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/11/2020 (tgw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Cleven Neal re: #5 Order. (meh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cleven Neal. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter). Ref to MJ/Bivins (tgw)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and #7 Notice of Change of Address filed by Colonial Trailways, Inc. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to motion on or before 8/5/2020 and Defendant shall file a reply by 8/13/2020. Clerk is DIRECTED to update docket reflecting Plaintiff's new address as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 07/15/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
July 14, 2020 REFERRAL OF #7 NOTICE of Suggestion of Change of Address for Plaintiff to Judge Bivins. (nah)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Suggestion of Change of Address for Plaintiff by Elizabeth D. Rehm (Rehm, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nah).
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Colonial Trailways, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Colonial Trailways, Inc. Responses due by 7/23/2020, Replies due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/2/2020. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
July 1, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Dismiss; DOCUMENT REFERRAL OF #4 Brief to Judge Bivins. (tgw)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 Brief filed by Colonial Trailways, Inc. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Colonial Trailways, Inc.. (Rehm, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Colonial Trailways, Inc.. (Rehm, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Colonial Trailways, Inc.. (Rehm, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2633875, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Colonial Trailways, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal) (Rehm, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (skb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Colonial Trailways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Trailways, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Rehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleven Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?