Skelly v. Country Club of Mobile
Plaintiff: Jennifer Skelly
Defendant: Country Club of Mobile
Case Number: 1:2020cv00343
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Filing Defendant's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Jennifer Skelly filed by Country Club of Mobile. (Willis, Kathryn)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER / Minutes [TEXT ONLY] Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Conference held on 8/25/2020. Court will reconvene by Telephone Conference on 9/1/2020 at 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins.)(mpp) Copies to counsel & emailed to pro se pltf.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Country Club of Mobile. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 11:30 AM in US Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins as set out. Clerk will provide call-in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 08/18/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
August 17, 2020 REFERRAL OF #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Bivins. (mab)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Willis, Kathryn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Country Club of Mobile. (Willis, Kathryn)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendant Country Club of Mobile; Disclosure Statement Due 8/11/2020. (tot)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/4/2020. (Attachment: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (copy mailed to Plf on 8/4/2020) (tot)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order REFERRING this action to the Magistrate Judge as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/4/2020. (copy mailed to Plf on 8/4/2020) (tot)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily C. Killion on behalf of Country Club of Mobile (Killion, Emily)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Country Club of Mobile. (Willis, Kathryn)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Country Club of Mobile served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (srd)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Country Club of Mobile. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (mab)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 07/10/2020. (ktw)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Jennifer Skelly. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins(PSU) (mab)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Country Club of Mobile, filed by Jennifer Skelly; referred to Judge Bivins(PSU) (mab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2020: #1 Redacted Version of Complaint) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skelly v. Country Club of Mobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Skelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Club of Mobile
Represented By: Kathryn M. Willis
Represented By: Emily C. Killion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?