Cook et al v. U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee
Plaintiff: Bishop Dupree Cook and Damita J. Cook
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00355
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332rp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 REFERRAL OF #14 Reply Brief, to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss , #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Gerhardt, Graham)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 8/21/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 08/17/2020. (jil)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Gerhardt, Graham)
August 11, 2020 REFERRAL OF #11 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss , #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bishop Dupree Cook, Damita J. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Eaton, Franklin)
August 8, 2020 Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Bank of America, N.A., Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee (Cassady, William)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Bank of America, N.A. and Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Gerhardt, Graham)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Gerhardt, Graham)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 8/10/2020; Replies due by 8/17/2020. Motion to be taken under submission on 8/18/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 08/03/2020. (jil)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Bishop Dupree Cook, Damita J. Cook. (Eaton, Franklin)
July 20, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of America, N.A., #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. Responses due by 8/3/2020; Replies due by 8/10/2020; Motion to be taken under submission on 8/11/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/20/20. (cmj)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Gerhardt, Graham)
July 20, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Gerhardt, Graham)
July 13, 2020 Answer due from U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (cmj)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2641944, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D") (Gerhardt, Graham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook et al v. U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bishop Dupree Cook
Represented By: Franklin Hollis Eaton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damita J. Cook
Represented By: Franklin Hollis Eaton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee
Represented By: Graham Webster Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Graham Webster Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?