Harrison v. Forde
Plaintiff: William Harrison
Defendant: Steve James Forde
Case Number: 1:2020cv00360
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam P. Plant on behalf of William Harrison (Plant, Adam)
August 31, 2020 REFERRAL OF #6 Response to Order to Judge Steele. (cmj)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #3 Service Order by William Harrison filed by William Harrison. (Battle, Robert)
July 22, 2020 REFERRAL OF #5 Amended Complaint to Judge Steele. (cmj)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steve James Forde, filed by William Harrison. (Battle, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for plaintiff to file an amended complaint adequately alleging subject matter jurisdiction as set out. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 7/27/2020.) Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/27/20. (cmj)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 7/17/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 8/31/2020.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/17/20. (cmj)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Steve James Forde. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steve James Forde ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2645511, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by William Harrison. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Disclosure Statement) (Battle, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Forde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Harrison
Represented By: Robert E. Battle
Represented By: Harlan F. Winn, III
Represented By: Adam P. Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve James Forde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?