Burdette v. Werner Co.
Plaintiff: Glenn Burdette
Defendant: Werner Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00365
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 REFERRAL OF #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Nelson. (cmj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Cooper, Robert)
September 4, 2020 REFERRAL OF #11 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Werner Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hale, Justin)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Glenn Burdette. Responses due by 9/3/2020; Replies due by 9/10/2020; Motion to be taken under submission on 9/11/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 8/20/20. (cmj)
August 20, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Glenn Burdette. (George, Christopher)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Werner Co., Werner US Sub Holding, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Werner Co., Werner Co. identifying Corporate Parent Werner Co. for Werner Co... (Cooper, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Werner Co. The statement does not satisfy the disclosure requirements of S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1. See S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1(b) ("The Disclosure Statement shall identify the represented entity's general nature and shall identify all parents, subsidiaries, partners, members, managers, trustees, affiliates, and similarly related persons and entities."); Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."). Werner Co. is ORDERED to file an amended disclosure statement that satisfies S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than Wed. 7/29/2020 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/22/2020. (ctn)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/22/20. (cmj)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Werner Co.. (Cooper, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Werner Co. re #1 Notice of Removal (Cooper, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Werner Co.. (Cooper, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2647634, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Werner Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cooper, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burdette v. Werner Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Burdette
Represented By: Christopher L. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Co.
Represented By: Robert E. Cooper
Represented By: Justin Isaac Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?