Ennis v. Bolling et al
Petitioner: Stephen Gerard Ennis
Respondent: Steve Marshall and Leon Bolling
Case Number: 1:2020cv00366
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order GRANTING #5 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Stephen Gerard Ennis. Petitioner is ORDERED to file his amended 2254 Petition NLT 9/30/2020 as set out. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner the Court's 2254 form. #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Stephen Gerard Ennis is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 08/26/2020. (srd) Copies to Petitioner.
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Stephen Gerard Ennis - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU) (tgw)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b), due to his failure to prosecute this action by complying with this Court's Order. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/20/2020. Copy mailed to Petitioner. (tgw) WITHDRAWN.
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 46031053986. Referred to MJ Murray (PSU). (meh)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order directing Petitioner to file this Court's form for a 2254 Petition & motion to proceed without prepayment of fees by 8/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/22/2020. Copy of Order, 2254 petition & IFP motion mailed to Petitioner. (tgw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Stephen Gerard Ennis. Referred to MJ Murray (PSU). (meh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ennis v. Bolling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leon Bolling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Gerard Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?