Redding et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Redding and Jeff Redding
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00367
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Notice Of Filing Service Of Process by Rachel Redding, Jeff Redding. Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020 (McKenna, Donald)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by C.R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Maughan, Diane)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 8/31/2020. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Maughan, Diane)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Notice Of Filing Service Of Process by Rachel Redding, Jeff Redding. C.R. Bard, Inc. served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020 (McKenna, Donald)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Rachel Redding, Jeff Redding as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (McKenna, Donald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Alias summons issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Note to Counsel: The Summons has been re-issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Jeff Redding, Rachel Redding Alias Summons In A Civil Action (McKenna, Donald)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Jeff Redding, Rachel Redding (McKenna, Donald)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Demand For Jury Trial against Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2648295, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Rachel Redding, Jeff Redding. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/20/2020. (McKenna, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redding et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Redding
Represented By: Donald P. McKenna, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Redding
Represented By: Donald P. McKenna, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?