Barfield v. Saul
Plaintiff: Judy Lynn Barfield
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00409
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to U.S. Attorney General. Acknowledgement filed by Judy Lynn Barfield. (Lassiter, Byron)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. Acknowledgement filed by Judy Lynn Barfield. (Lassiter, Byron)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judy Lynn Barfield. Andrew M Saul served on 9/4/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Lassiter, Byron)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver McDonald on behalf of Andrew M Saul (McDonald, Oliver)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/19/20. (cmj)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2662724, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Judy Lynn Barfield. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. Atty, #2 Summons - U.S. Atty General, #3 Summons - OGC, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lassiter, Byron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barfield v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Lynn Barfield
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Oliver McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?