Mcleod v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: John McLeod
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv00410
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brandee J. Kowalzyk. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/6/20. (skb)
October 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #47 MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. A Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (mbp)
October 2, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2687637, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit COG) (Kowalzyk, Brandee)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/18/20. (cmj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc. (Maughan, Diane)
September 16, 2020 REFERRAL OF #45 Reply to Judge Steele. (cmj)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order re: #43 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc is GRANTED to the extent that the Clerk of Court is instructed to refrain from issuing a Preliminary Scheduling Order until 12/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/11/20. (mbp)
September 10, 2020 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc. (Maughan, Diane)
September 10, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #43 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc. Remaining defendants' replies, as set out, due by 9/16/2020. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/9/20. (cmj)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING defendant McKesson Corporation without prejudice re: Stipulation of Dismissal #38 filed by McKesson Corporation. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/9/20. (cmj)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jordan E Jarreau and Melissa Dorman Matthews terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9-3-20. (lly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Melissa Dorman Matthews and Jordan E. Jarreau to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Maughan, Diane)
September 3, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #39 MOTION for Melissa Dorman Matthews and Jordan E. Jarreau to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
September 2, 2020 REFERRAL OF #38 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge Steele. (cmj)
September 1, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION of Dismissal Jointly Filed by Plaintiff and by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Maughan, Diane)
August 28, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by George LaFayette Morris on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Morris, George)
August 28, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Maughan, Diane)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Taylor Daly. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/27/20. (cmj)
August 27, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T. Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2668137, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Daly, Taylor)
August 27, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #34 MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T. Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. G Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
August 21, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by George LaFayette Morris on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc (Morris, George)
August 21, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc (Maughan, Diane)
August 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Judge Steele (cmj)
August 18, 2020 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02241. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 REFERRAL OF #31 Case Transferred In - District Transfer to Judge Murray. (cmj)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Robert Cordovez's case be severed and transferred to the Fort Lauderdale Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2236 opened); b. Plaintiff Marilena Cruz's case be severed and transferred to the Philadelphia Division of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2237 opened); c. Plaintiff Patti Duncan's case be severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2238 opened); d. Plaintiff Shelly Hopkins's case be severed and transferred to the Las Cruces Division of the District of New Mexico (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2239 opened); e. Plaintiff Samantha Hunter's case be severed and transferred to the San Francisco Division of the Northern District of California (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2240 opened); f. Plaintiff John Mcleod's case be severed and transferred to the Mobile Division of the Southern District of Alabama (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2241 opened); g. Plaintiff Hamby Rose's case be severed and transferred to the Evansville Division of the Southern District of Indiana (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2242 opened); h. Plaintiff Silvia Marquez's case be severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2243 opened); i. Plaintiff Slade Otis's case be severed and transferred to the Greenbelt Division of the District of Maryland (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2244 opened). Plaintiff Patsy Childress is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #23 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #27 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 28 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Patsy Childress, Robert Cordovez, Marilena Cruz, Patti Duncan, Shelly Hopkins, Samantha Hunter, Silvia Marquez, John McLeod, Hamby Rose, Otis Slade re #27 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 27 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Patsy Childress, Robert Cordovez, Marilena Cruz, Patti Duncan, Shelly Hopkins, Samantha Hunter, Silvia Marquez, John McLeod, Hamby Rose, Otis Slade (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation re: #23 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 25 Appendix in Support filed by Patsy Childress, Robert Cordovez, Marilena Cruz, Patti Duncan, Shelly Hopkins, Samantha Hunter, Silvia Marquez, John McLeod, Hamby Rose, Otis Slade re #23 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Patsy Childress, Robert Cordovez, Marilena Cruz, Patti Duncan, Shelly Hopkins, Samantha Hunter, Silvia Marquez, John McLeod, Hamby Rose, Otis Slade re #23 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Patsy Childress, Robert Cordovez, Marilena Cruz, Patti Duncan, Shelly Hopkins, Samantha Hunter, Silvia Marquez, John McLeod, Hamby Rose, Otis Slade (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Patsy Childress, Robert Cordovez, Marilena Cruz, Patti Duncan, Shelly Hopkins, Samantha Hunter, Silvia Marquez, John McLeod, Hamby Rose, Otis Slade re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Patsy Childress, Robert Cordovez, Marilena Cruz, Patti Duncan, Shelly Hopkins, Samantha Hunter, Silvia Marquez, John McLeod, Hamby Rose, Otis Slade (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Patsy Childress, Robert Cordovez, Marilena Cruz, Patti Duncan, Shelly Hopkins, Samantha Hunter, Silvia Marquez, John McLeod, Hamby Rose, Otis Slade (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer. All future pleadings shall subsequently be filed under Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-01473-S. Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/10/2020) (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) (Main Document 10 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) (Main Document 9 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) Modified text on 6/10/2020 (dsr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) Modified text on 6/10/2020 (dsr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY/INCORRECT DOCUMENT FILED***CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) Modified on 6/10/2020 (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY/INCORRECT DOCUMENT FILED***CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) Modified on 6/10/2020 (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10896665) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D-1 Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-2 Childress - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-3, 2020-04-06 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-4. 2020-04-06 - Civil Case Information Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-5 2020-04-06 - Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-6. 2020-04-07 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-7. 2020-04-07 - Citation Issued to C. R. Bard, #13 Exhibit(s) D-8 2020-04-07 - Citation Issued to McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-9. 2020-04-09 - Notice of Initial Dismissal Hearing, #15 Exhibit(s) D-10. 2020-05-06 - Executed Affidavit of Service to McKesson- 05-01-2020, #16 Exhibit(s) D-11 2020-05-22 - Executed Return of Service to C. R. Bard - 05-20-2020, #17 Exhibit(s) D-12. 06-04-2020 - Executed Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #18 Exhibit(s) D-13. 06-04-2020 Notice of Initial Dismissal Hearing (08-06-2020) (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mcleod v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McLeod
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?