Poarch Band of Creek Indians v. Cardinal Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: Poarch Band of Creek Indians
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00443
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 REFERRAL OF #14 Reply in Support of #11 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation to Senior Judge Granade. (mab)
October 30, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to #11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Order, City of Orlando v. CVS Health Corp., No. 6:20-cv-00736- RBD-EJK (M.D. Fla. June 15, 2020), Doc. 75, #2 Exhibit 2 Order Staying Actions Pending JPML Action, County of Alameda v. Purdue Pharma L.P., No. 4:19-cv-02307-JST (N.D. Cal. June 10, 2019), Doc. 29, #3 Exhibit 3 Order, Takoma Regl Hosp. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., No. 2:19-cv-00157 (E.D. Tenn. Oct. 4, 2019), Doc. 93) (Nix, Jess)
October 26, 2020 REFERRAL OF #13 Reply Brief in Support of #7 Motion to Remand to Judge Senior Judge Granade. (mab)
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Poarch Band of Creek Indians re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Poarch Band of Creek Indians. (Frazer, Thomas)
October 26, 2020 REFERRAL OF #12 Response in Opposition to #11 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Memorandum of Law in Support to Senior Judge Granade. (mab)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Poarch Band of Creek Indians. (Frazer, Thomas)
October 21, 2020 REFERRAL OF #11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Memorandum of Law in Support to Judge Granade. (tot)
October 21, 2020 REFERRAL OF #10 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Murray. (tot)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Non-Exhaustive List of Tribal Cases Transferred to MDL, #2 Exhibit 2 JPML Dkt. 8465, #3 Exhibit 3 Order Granting Motion to Stay, Lac Courte Oreilles Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians v. McKesson Corp., No. 3:18-cv-00286-JDP (W.D. Wis. May 25, 2018), Doc. 26, #4 Exhibit 4 Order Granting Motion to Stay, Robinson Rancheria v. McKesson Corp., No. 3:18-cv-02525 (N.D. Cal. July 16, 2018), Doc. 23, #5 Exhibit 5 Order Granting Motion to Stay, Takoma Regional Hosp., Inc. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., No. 2:19-cv-157, Doc. 93 (E.D. Tenn. Oct. 4, 2019), #6 Exhibit 6 Order, Franklin Cty. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al., No. 7:19-cv-00302-MFU (W.D. Va. May 1, 2019), Doc. 33, #7 Exhibit 7 Order, City of Alexandria v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al., No. 1:18-cv-01536 (E.D. Va. Jan. 30, 2019), Doc. 63, #8 Exhibit 8 Order, Cty. of San Mateo v. McKesson Corp. et al., No. 4:18-cv-04535-JST (N.D. Cal. Aug. 28, 2018), Doc. 22, #9 Exhibit 9 Minute Entry, Village of Melrose Park et al. v. McKesson Corp. et al., No. 1:18-cv-05288 (N.D. Ill. Aug. 10, 2018), Doc. 26, #10 Exhibit 10 Order, St. Bernard Parish Govt v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al., No. 2:18-cv-02717-NJB-DEK (E.D. La. Mar. 29, 2018), Doc. 21, #11 Exhibit 11 Order, Cty. of Floyd v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al., No. 7:17-cv-00186-GFVT (E.D. Ky. Jan. 22, 2018), Doc. 18) (Nix, Jess)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Order Granting Motion to Stay, Lac Courte Oreilles Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians v. McKesson Corp. et al., No. 3:18-cv-00286-jdp (W.D. Wis. May 25, 2018), Doc. 26, #2 Exhibit 2 JPML Dkt. 8465, #3 Exhibit 3 Robinson Rancheria v. McKesson Corp., No. 3:18-cv-02525 (N.D. Cal. July 16, 2018), Doc. 23, #4 Exhibit 4 Statement of Interest, In re Natl Prescription Opiate Litig., No. 1:17-md-02804 (N.D. Ohio), Doc. 161) (Nix, Jess)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On October 5, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Remand requesting that this action be remanded to the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama. (Doc. 7). This motion has been referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and S.D. Ala. Gen. LR 72. Defendant is ORDERED to file its response to Plaintiff's motion on or before October 19, 2020. Plaintiff's reply, if any, must be filed on or before October 26, 2020, at which time the Court will take the motion under submission. Once the motion is taken under submission, no further briefs or submissions related to the issues raised in the motion may be filed without leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/6/20. (lto)
October 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (clr)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
October 5, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (mab)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Poarch Band of Creek Indians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Frazer, Thomas)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 List of subsidiaries of Cardinal Health, Inc.) (Payne, Joshua)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Blank Disclosure Statement form emailed to Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc., Disclosure Statement Due 9/15/2020 pursuant to Civil LR. 7.1(a). (mab)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ORDER, GRANTING #2 Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Agreed-Upon Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant's response to complaint in this action is due sixty (60) days after the later of: 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate the Conditional Transfer Order or otherwise denying transfer; or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/11/2020. (mab)
September 11, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Agreed-Upon Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint Referred to Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Entry of Agreed-Upon Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Conditional Transfer Order), #2 Exhibit 2 (Judge Steele Order granting extension)) (Payne, Joshua)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2674503, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit All state court documents filed or served on Cardinal Health, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Spotswood, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poarch Band of Creek Indians v. Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poarch Band of Creek Indians
Represented By: Archie C. Lamb, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick D. McMurtray
Represented By: T. R. Frazer, III
Represented By: Thomas Roe Frazer, II
Represented By: J. Nixon Daniel, III
Represented By: Frederick T. Kuykendall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Kerry Payne
Represented By: Jess Randall Nix
Represented By: Robert K. Spotswood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?