Garber v. City Of Fairhope et al
Plaintiff: Sandy Garber
Defendant: Jimmy Conyers, Jack Burrell, City Of Fairhope, Jay Robinson, Mayor Karin Wilson, Robert Brown and Kevin Boone
Case Number: 1:2020cv00447
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's embedded request for attorney's fees and costs is denied. This action is remanded to the Circuit Court of Baldwin County, Alabama. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/26/20. (cmj)
September 29, 2020 REFERRAL OF #7 Reply Brief to Judge Steele. (cmj)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Sandy Garber re: #2 MOTION to Remand , #6 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Sandy Garber. (Pilcher, Mary)
September 22, 2020 REFERRAL OF #6 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Steele. (cmj)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Kevin Boone, Robert Brown, Jack Burrell, City Of Fairhope, Jimmy Conyers, Jay Robinson, Karin Wilson. (Wolfe, Kary)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Kevin Boone, Robert Brown, Jack Burrell, City Of Fairhope, Jimmy Conyers, Jay Robinson, Karin Wilson not later than seven calendar days after the date of the Court's ruling on the pending Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/14/20. (cmj)
September 14, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal to Judge Steele (cmj)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal filed by All Defendants. (Wolfe, Kary)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Sandy Garber Responses due by 9/24/2020; Replies due by 10/1/2020; Motion to be taken under submission on 10/1/2020. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/11/20. (cmj)
September 11, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Remand referred to Judge Steele. (mbp)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand filed by Sandy Garber. (Pilcher, Mary)
September 10, 2020 Answer due from defendants within seven days after the notice of removal is filed per FRCP 12(a). (cmj)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2675153, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complete State Court File) (McDonald, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garber v. City Of Fairhope et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Garber
Represented By: Mary E. Pilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Conyers
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Kary Bryant Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Burrell
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Kary Bryant Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Fairhope
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Kary Bryant Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Robinson
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Kary Bryant Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Karin Wilson
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Kary Bryant Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Brown
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Kary Bryant Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Boone
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Kary Bryant Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?