Norton v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Blake Norton
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv00460
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2022 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge William H. Steele. Jury Selection set for 8/2/2022 08:45 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge William H. Steele. Discovery cutoff 12/7/2020 (see other deadlines). Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2021. Motions due by 2/15/2022. Position Regarding Settlement due by 1/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/10/20. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (cmj) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 9, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Amendment to #21 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Daly, Taylor)
November 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Scheduling Conference held on 11/9/2020. Order to follow. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (tgw)
November 9, 2020 REFERRAL OF #24 Amended Document to Judge Nelson. (cmj)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order setting telephonic scheduling conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 10:00 AM with Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/2/20. (cmj)
October 29, 2020 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Daly, Taylor)
October 29, 2020 REFERRAL OF #21 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Nelson. (cmj)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T. Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice for C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/7/2020. (ctn)
October 7, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T. Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. G Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (mbp)
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T. Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2688968, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit COG) (Daly, Taylor)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice for C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/6/2020. (ctn)
October 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. A Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (srd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2687624, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit COG) (Kowalzyk, Brandee)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Withdraw for Richard B. North, Jr. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively terminate North as counsel for the Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/29/2020. (ctn)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Barry D. Levy to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Barry JD Levy terminated as counsel for the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/29/2020. (ctn)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 MOTION and APPLICATION for Steven S. Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/29/2020. (ctn)
September 29, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Withdraw for Richard B. North, Jr. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw for Richard B. North, Jr. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Morris, George)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Barry D. Levy to Withdraw as Attorney filed by All Plaintiffs. (Schulte, Steven)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION and APPLICATION for Steven S. Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2683349, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Northern District of Texas) (Schulte, Steven)
September 25, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION and APPLICATION for Steven S. Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala, #11 MOTION for Barry D. Levy to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #7 Disclosure Statement filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/21/2020. (ctn)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated; C R Bard Incorporated. (Steele, William)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by George LaFayette Morris on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-01900. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 17, 2020 Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH). That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of this District is directed to transfer the cases listed on Schedule A to appropriate districts for further proceedings. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/10/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-01900-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14346305 filed by Nicholas Blake Norton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Blake Norton
Represented By: Barry JD Levy
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?