National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc. v. Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC et al
Plaintiff: National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc.
Defendant: Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC and Donald Childers
Case Number: 1:2020cv00483
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
2 Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER, GRANTING #2 motion for preliminary injunction; DENYING #21 amended motion for preliminary injunction; and PRELIMINARILY ENJOINING Defendants as set forth in Order. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/24/2020. (mab) (Main Document 27 replaced on 11/24/2020) (mab).
November 23, 2020 Filing 29 Response to Copyright Infringement filed by Donald Childers, Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab) (Main Document 29 replaced on 11/25/2020) (mab). Modified on 11/25/2020 (mab).
November 23, 2020 Filing 28 Supplemental Response to Copyright Infringement and Request for Extension to File Evidence. filed by Donald Childers, Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Evidence in Support, #2 Evidence in Support, #3 Evidence in Support, #4 Evidence in Support, #5 Evidence in Support); referred to Judge Moorer (mab) (Main Document 28 replaced on 11/25/2020) (mab). Modified on 11/25/2020 (mab).
November 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Terry F. Moorer: Hearing held on 11/18/2020 re #21 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc. Court Reporter Cheryl Powell. (mab)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendant Childers' #24 Motion for a Teleconference for Hearing on Wednesday, November 18th, 2020, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The request to attend the hearing set for 11/18/20 by telephone is GRANTED; however, Defendant's request to attend all hearings by telephone is DENIED without prejudice to refile prior to other hearings. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/18/2020. (copy mailed to Dft Childers on 11/19/2020) (mab) Modified on 11/19/2020 (tot).
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendant Childers' #24 Motion for a Teleconference for Hearing on Wednesday, November 18th, 2020 is CARRIED to the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/18/2020. (mab)
November 17, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Teleconference for Hearing on 11/18/2020 filed by Donald Childers. (Referred to J/Moorer on 11/18/2020) (tot)
November 17, 2020 REFERRAL OF #23 Notice of Service Status to Judge Moorer. (tot)
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc. of Service Status (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Collier, Danny)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order, GRANTING #16 Motion for Harry V. Satterwhite to Withdraw; DENYING #17 Motion to Appoint Counsel and motion for Extension of Time; and SETTING evidentiary hearing re: Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction for 11/18/2020 at 4:00 p.m. in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/12/2020. (copies to Defts as directed) (mab)
November 12, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #21 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
November 12, 2020 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Declaration of John Zarian) (Collier, Danny)
November 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Terry F. Moorer: Telephone Conference held on 11/10/2020. Court Reporter Roy Isbell. (mab)
November 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Terry F. Moorer: Hearing held on 11/10/2020 re #16 Motion for Harry V. Satterwhite to Withdraw as Attorney as to Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC, Donald Childers, and #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Extension of Time filed by Donald Childers. Court Reporter Roy Isbell. Motion to withdraw to be granted; motion to appoint counsel and for extension to be denied. Written order to follow. (mab)
November 9, 2020 REFERRAL OF #20 Notice Pursuant to Court #19 Order Concerning Telephonic Hearing to Judge Moorer. (mab)
November 9, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by All Defendants Pursuant to Court Order Concerning Telephonic Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice) (Satterwhite, Harry)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order, setting telephonic hearing on the #16 Motion for Harry V. Satterwhite to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants for 11/10/2020 at 9:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Briefing on preliminary injunction and the preliminary injunction hearing are temporarily suspended pending resolution of the issue of counsel. Donald Childers is required to attend the telephonic hearing. Mr. Satterwhite is ORDERED to notify each of the defendants of the hearing to include sending a copy of this Order to them as well as the call-in information upon receipt. Clerk is directed to send call-in information to counsel and to send copy of Order to Defendants at address in Order. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/3/2020. (mab)
November 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in support of #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel adn MOTION for Extension of Time (Attachment: #1 Attachments); referred to Judge Moorer (mab)
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Donald Childers, (Attachments: #1 Employee Pay Statement, #2 Duplicate Letter to Judge Milling); Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
November 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Harry V. Satterwhite to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
November 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Harry V. Satterwhite to Withdraw as Attorney filed by All Defendants. (Satterwhite, Harry)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file by November 6, 2020, a response to Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing on motion set for Tuesday, November 10, 2020, at 9:00 a.m., to be held in Courtroom 3B, United States Courthouse, Mobile, Alabama. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/28/2020. (mab)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/11/2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 10/28/2020. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #12 filed by Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC (Milling, Bert)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC. (Satterwhite, Harry)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Donald Childers, Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC. (Satterwhite, Harry)
October 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Case re-assigned to District Judge Terry F. Moorer. Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-M after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 Service Notice entered 10/1/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 11/16/2020. (tot)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Donald Childers, Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
October 1, 2020 REFERRAL OF #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support to Judge Granade. (tot)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc. (Collier, Danny)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc. (APG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc.. (Collier, Danny)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Brief filed by National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc. re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Caceres Declaration, #2 Fore Declaration, #3 Hebdon Declaration, #4 Hebdon Ex 1, #5 Hebdon Ex 2, #6 Hebdon Ex 3, #7 Hebdon Ex 4, #8 Hebdon Ex 5, #9 Jones Declaration, #10 Jones Ex 1, #11 Jones Ex 2, #12 Jones Ex 3, #13 Jones Ex 4, #14 Keliipuleole Declaration, #15 Keliipuleole Ex 1, #16 Keliipuleole Ex 2, #17 Keliipuleole Ex 3, #18 Keliipuleole Ex 4, #19 Keliipuleole Ex 5, #20 Keliipuleole Ex 6, #21 Keliipuleole Ex 7, #22 Keliipuleole Ex 8, #23 Keliipuleole Ex 9, #24 Keliipuleole Ex 10, #25 Keliipuleole Ex 11, #26 Sicklesteel Declaration, #27 Toon Declaration, #28 Toon Ex 1, #29 Toon Ex 2, #30 Toon Ex 3, #31 Toon Ex 4, #32 Toon Ex 5, #33 Toon Ex 6, #34 Toon Ex 7, #35 Toon Ex 8, #36 Toon Ex 9, #37 Toon Ex 10, #38 Toon Ex 11, #39 Toon Ex 12, #40 Toon Ex 13, #41 Toon Ex 14, #42 Zarian Declaration, #43 Zarian Ex 1) (Collier, Danny)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc.. (Collier, Danny)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald Childers, Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC ( Receipt number 54971P, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc.. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/29/2020. (Collier, Danny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc. v. Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Equipment Training, LLC
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Childers
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Commission for the Certification of Crane Operators, Inc.
Represented By: Danny J. Collier, Jr.
Represented By: Regina Ford Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?