Carstarphen v. Saul
Plaintiff: Barbara Carstarphen
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00506
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/16/20. (skb) (copy to US Atty w/summons on 10/7/20)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul (SSA, US Atty, US Atty Gen). (skb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2020: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (skb).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Plf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve Dft as set out. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to designate this case as a Southern Division case & update the docket sheet as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/16/2020. (tot)
October 15, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (skb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Barbara Carstarphen. (Coplin, William)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Barbara Carstarphen. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coplin, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (skb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carstarphen v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Carstarphen
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?