Padgett v. Dunn et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Joseph Keith Padgett
Defendant: Arnaldo Mercado, Mary Cooks, Christy Vincent, Matthew Brand, Cheryl Price, Jeffrey Williams, Angelia Norman, Grantt Culliver, Anne Hill and Jefferson S. Dunn
Case Number: 1:2021cv00016
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order DIRECTING Plaintiff to complete and file this Court's current form for a complaint and for a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees NLT 2/9/21. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/11/21. (skb) (Copy to Plaintiff w/form 1/14/21)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Keith Padgett. (skb)
January 8, 2021 REFERRAL OF #6 Case Transferred In - District Transfer to Judge Nelson(PSU). (tot)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:20-cv-01021. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) Plf's #4 objections are OVERRULED; (2) The Magistrate Judge's #3 Recommendation is adopted; (3) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama under 28 USC 1404; DIRECTING the Clerk to take the necessary steps to effectuate the transfer of this action; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/6/2021. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/7/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Case transferred to District of Alabama Southern. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/7/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge by Joseph Keith Padgett. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/7/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC 1404(a); Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 12/16/2020. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/7/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Joseph Keith Padgett. (hrs, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/7/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Matthew Brand, Mary Cooks, Grantt Culliver, Jefferson S. Dunn, Anne Hill, Arnaldo Mercado, Angelia Norman, Cheryl Price, Christy Vincent, Jeffrey Williams, filed by Joseph Keith Padgett.(hrs, )[Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padgett v. Dunn et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnaldo Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelia Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Keith Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?