Turner v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Lakeisha Turner
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv00088
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order re: #17 Joint Notice of Settlement and Motion for Stay. The parties are DIRECTED to file appropriate dismissal paperwork or a status report on or before 8/18/2021 as set out. The Court GRANTS the #17 Joint MOTION to Stay. All deadlines & hearings are continued until further notice from the Court. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/21/21. (tot)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion & Application for Kelly Chermack to Appear Pro Hac Vice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/21/21. (tot)
April 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Lakeisha Turner re #16 MOTION and APPLICATION for Kelly Chermack to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. G (Chermack, Kelly)
April 20, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Lakeisha Turner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Chermack, Kelly)
April 20, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 Joint Notice of Settlement and MOTION to Stay Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION and APPLICATION for Kelly Chermack to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2794960, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State Bar of Texas, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia) (Chermack, Kelly)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/1/21. (tot)
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2784858, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Kowalzyk, Brandee)
April 1, 2021 REFERRAL OF #12 MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Moorer. (tot)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Taylor T. Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/31/21. (tot)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Dfts' #10 Motion for Leave for Richard B. North, Jr., to Withdraw as Counsel as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/31/21. (tot)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T. Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2784537, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Daly, Taylor)
March 31, 2021 REFERRAL OF #11 MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T. Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Moorer. (tot)
March 10, 2021 REFERRAL OF #10 MOTION for Richard B. North, Jr., to Withdraw as Attorney to Judge Moorer. (tot)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Richard B. North, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Cassady, William)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by George LaFayette Morris on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03171. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-03171-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16920468 filed by Lakeisha Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeisha Turner
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?