Buster v. B&D Maritime, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Russel Buster
Defendant: TCJ Holdings, LP, B&D Maritime, Inc., Thomas P. Williams, Jr., Williams Management LLC and Randy W. Boggs
Case Number: 1:2021cv00137
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Claim by B&D Maritime, Inc., Randy W. Boggs. by B&D Maritime, Inc., Randy W. Boggs. (McCallum, LaBella)
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDMENT TO ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against B&D Maritime, Inc., Randy W. Boggs, TCJ Holdings, LP, Thomas P. Williams, Jr, Williams Management LLC by Russel Buster. (Dailey, James)
May 10, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas P. Williams, Jr, TCJ Holdings, LP, Williams Management LLC. Thomas P. Williams, Jr waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021; TCJ Holdings, LP waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021; Williams Management LLC waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Bolin, Christina)
April 27, 2021 Filing 14 Buster's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand AND CLAIM by Russel Buster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint) (Dailey, James)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, GRANTING #12 Motion to Withdraw by Attorney Allen E. Graham and Edward Barrett Hails. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/19/2021. (mab)
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Allen E. Graham and E. Barrett Hails to Withdraw as Attorney filed by B&D Maritime, Inc.. (Graham, Allen)
April 19, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Allen E. Graham and E. Barrett Hails to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, construing #8 Motion to Substitute Counsel to be a notice of appearance at to attorneys LeBella S. McCallum and Eric D. Hoaglund. Attorneys Allen E. Graham and E. Barrett Hails are DIRECTED to file a motion to withdraw as counsel. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/14/2021. (mab)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 Summonses Issued as to B&D Maritime, Inc., Randy W. Boggs, TCJ Holdings, LP, Thomas P. Williams, Jr, Williams Management LLC. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by B&D Maritime, Inc., Randy W. Boggs. (McCallum, LaBella)
April 9, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Approving B&D Maritime, Inc.'s Letter of Undertaking, Restraining Prosecution of Claims, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Setting Deadline to Assert Claims, GRANTING #5 Motion for Interim Relief and for Entry of a Concursus Order; directing Clerk to issue notice to claimants; setting deadline for claims to be filed by 6/23/2021; directing U.S. Marshal to publish notice as set forth in the order; RESTRAINING, STAYING and ENJOINING further prosecution of any and all claims. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/8/2021. (Attachment: #1 Notice to Claimants) (mab)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by B&D Maritime, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant B&D Maritime, Inc.. (Hails, Edward)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION interim relief and entry of concursus order filed by B&D Maritime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hails, Edward)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability and Third Party Complaint ( Filing fee $402 Receipt Number AALSDC-2785188, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by B&D Maritime, Inc., Randy W. Boggs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Graham, Allen)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by B&D Maritime, Inc., Randy W. Boggs. (Hails, Edward)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Russel Buster (Benton, Thomas)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2781997, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Russel Buster. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 6/23/2021. (Benton, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buster v. B&D Maritime, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCJ Holdings, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&D Maritime, Inc.
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Represented By: LaBella S. McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy W. Boggs
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Represented By: LaBella S. McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel Buster
Represented By: Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Represented By: James J. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?