SE Property Holdings, LLC v. The Mitchell Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JDC Acquisition Corporation, Survivor, LLC, Holiday Isle, LLC and The Mitchell Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00214
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. (Newman, J.)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (srd)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Survivor, LLC. (McKerall, Samuel)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed addressed to Holiday Isle, LLC and to JDC Acquisition Corp by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Holiday Isle, LLC served on 5/10/2021, answer due 5/31/2021; JDC Acquisition Corporation served on 5/10/2021, answer due 5/31/2021 (Attachments: #1 Summons Served - Holiday Isle) (Newman, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2021: #2 Cert Mail Ret, #3 Certified Mail Ret) (srd).
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed addressed to Survivor, LLC by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Survivor, LLC served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021 (Newman, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2021: #1 Cert Mail Ret) (srd).
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed addressed to The Mitchell Co. by SE Property Holdings, LLC. The Mitchell Company, Inc. served on 5/10/2021, answer due 5/31/2021 (Newman, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2021: #1 Cert Mail Ret) (srd).
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Holiday Isle, LLC, JDC Acquisition Corporation, Survivor, LLC, The Mitchell Company, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/5/2021) (srd).
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by SE Property Holdings, LLC addressed to The Mitchell Co., et al (Attachments: #1 Survivor Summons, #2 Holiday Summons, #3 JDC Summons) (Newman, J.)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2803363, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Newman, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SE Property Holdings, LLC v. The Mitchell Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDC Acquisition Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Survivor, LLC
Represented By: Samuel G. McKerall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Isle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mitchell Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Archibald T. Reeves, IV
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?