Poe v. Schiffarhts et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy L. Poe
Defendant: Briesesee Briese Schiffarhts, M/V BBC Romania, Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG, Briesesee Briese Schiffahrts and Briese Crew Management GmbH
Case Number: 1:2021cv00222
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Briese Schiffahrts GmbH & CO KG, M/V BBC Romania. (Rue, Thomas)
June 1, 2021 Answer due from Briese Schiffahrts GmbH & CO KG pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (mab)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 Admiralty Claim filed by Briese Schiffahrts GmbH & CO KG - Verified Claim and Statement of Owner's Interest. (Sharp, Thomas)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 Alias Summons Issued as to Briese Schiffahrts GmbH & CO KG, Briesesee Briese Schiffahrts. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Briese Crew Management GmbH. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Jeremy L. Poe (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Huey, Michael)
May 20, 2021 REFERRAL OF #4 Notice Regarding Service to Judge Moorer. (tot)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jeremy L. Poe Regarding Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Huey, Michael)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT Under USC 33 905(b) and General Maritime Law against All Defendants, filed by Jeremy L. Poe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Huey, Michael)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Briese Schiffahrts GmbH & CO KG, Briesesee Briese Schiffahrts. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under USC 33 905(b) and General Maritime Law against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2805645, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jeremy L. Poe. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Huey, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poe v. Schiffarhts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy L. Poe
Represented By: Michael G. Huey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briesesee Briese Schiffarhts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V BBC Romania
Represented By: Thomas S. Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG
Represented By: Thomas S. Rue
Represented By: Thomas E. Sharp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briesesee Briese Schiffahrts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briese Crew Management GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?