Morris Barnes, et al. v. Sony Music Entertainment Group et al
Plaintiff: Will-Burn Records and Publishing Co., Willie Ash and Morris Barnes
Defendant: Gabriella Wilson, David Przygoda, Sony BMG Music, Keenon Daequan Ray Jackson, Atlantic Records, Charles Carter, Julius Dubose, Elijah Dias, RCA Recrods: Jive RCA, Roger Parker, Sony Music Entertainment Group, Steven Arrington, Tunji Balogun, Def Jam Records, Warner Music Group, Universal Music Group, Jermaine Dupri, Waung Hankerson, Keep Cool Records, Tiara Thomas, Cardo Ronald Latour, Republic Records Universal Motown Record Group, Bashar Barakah Jackson Jackson, Shawn Carter, Christopher Maurice Brown, RCA Records: Jive RCA and Bashar Barakah Jackson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00223
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order, extending the Rule 4(m) deadline for Plaintiffs to serve Defendants to 10/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/13/2021. (copy to Pltfs) (mab)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Republic Records Universal Motown Record Group. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Copies provided to Plaintiff for service. (cjr)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 Alias Summons Reissued as to Republic Records Universal Motown Record Group, and mailed to Plaintiff for service. (mab)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 Summonses Issued as to Atlantic Records, Def Jam Records, Keep Cool Records, RCA Records: Jive RCA, Sony BMG Music, Sony Music Entertainment Group, Universal Music Group, Warner Music Group, and mailed to Plaintiff for service. (mab)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Steven Arrington, Tunji Balogun, Christopher Maurice Brown (Def Jam Recording & RCA), Charles Carter, Shawn Carter, Elijah Dias, Julius Dubose (Atlantic Record & Warner Music Group), Jermaine Dupri, Waung Hankerson, Bashar Barakah Jackson, Keenon Daequan Ray Jackson (Def Jam Recording & RCA Records), Cardo Ronald Latour (RCA Records & Def Jam Recording), Roger Parker, David Przygoda, Republic Records Universal Motown Record Group, Tiara Thomas, Gabriella Wilson. (Mailed to Plf w/cover letter re: service on 7/26/21) (tot)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: #5 Amended Complaint filed by Morris Barnes, Willie Ash. (ajl)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Willie Ash, Morris Barnes. (tot)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven Arrington, Atlantic Records, Tunji Balogun, Christopher Maurice Brown, Charles Carter, Shawn Carter, Def Jam Records, Elijah Dias, Julius Dubose, Jermaine Dupri, Waung Hankerson, Bashar Barakah Jackson, Keenon Daequan Ray Jackson, Keep Cool Records, Cardo Ronald Latour, Roger Parker, David Przygoda, RCA Records: Jive RCA, Republic Records Universal Motown Record Group, Sony BMG Music, Sony Music Entertainment Group, Tiara Thomas, Universal Music Group, Warner Music Group, Gabriella Wilson filed by Morris Barnes, Willie Ash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Discovery Requests) (Referred to MJ/Nelson(PSU) on 6/2/21) (tot)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order, directing Pltf Will-Burn Records to retain counsel by 6/14/2021, and directing Pltfs to re-file complaint with Pltf Ash's signature and contact information by 6/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/17/2021. (copy to pltf) (mab)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 46031056043 paid on 5/10/2021. (meh)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order, REFERRING action to the Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/13/2021. (mab)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Arrington, Atlantic Records, Tunji Balogun, Christopher Maurice Brown, Charles Carter, Shawn Carter, Def Jam Records, Elijah Dias, Julius Dubose, Jermaine Dupri, Waung Hankerson, Bashar Barakah Jackson, Keenon Daequan Ray Jackson, Keep Cool Records, Cardo Ronald Latour, Roger Parker, David Przygoda, RCA Recrods: Jive RCA, Republic Records Universal Motown Record Group, Sony BMG Music, Sony Music Entertainment Group, Tiara Thomas, Universal Music Group, Warner Music Group, filed by Morris Barnes. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Discovery Requests) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris Barnes, et al. v. Sony Music Entertainment Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriella Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Przygoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony BMG Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keenon Daequan Ray Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julius Dubose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elijah Dias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCA Recrods: Jive RCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tunji Balogun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Def Jam Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine Dupri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waung Hankerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keep Cool Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiara Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardo Ronald Latour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Records Universal Motown Record Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bashar Barakah Jackson Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Maurice Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCA Records: Jive RCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bashar Barakah Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will-Burn Records and Publishing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?