Martin v. Hard
Plaintiff: Brent Edward Martin
Defendant: Zachary S. Hard
Case Number: 1:2021cv00230
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order GRANTING #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brent Edward Martin and directing payment of partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall REMIT $53.40 by 7/13/2021 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 06/22/2021. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brent Edward Martin. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brent Edward Martin. Plaintiff is ORDERED to sign page five and return Motion for IFP by 6/28/2021. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff his original motion and retain a copy in the Court's file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/27/2021. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff.
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brent Edward Martin. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd) Modified on 6/4/2021 (srd).
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brent Edward Martin. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Motion for IFP by 6/17/2021 on the Court's form or pay the filing fee as set out. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the form for a motion for IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/17/2021. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff.
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brent Edward Martin. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Zachary S. Hard, filed by Brent Edward Martin. (srd) Referred to Judge Nelson (PSU).
May 11, 2021 MOTION to Appoint Counsel with Doc #1 Complaint filed by Brent Edward Martin. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Hard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary S. Hard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Edward Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?