Galarza v. One Call Claims, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joel Galarza
Defendant: Kelly Smoot, One Call Claims, LLC, Texas Windstorm Insurance Association and Kristi Smoot
Case Number: 1:2021cv00250
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: William E Cassady
2 Judge: Callie V S Granade
3 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Filing 76 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by One Call Claims, LLC, Kelly Smoot, Kristi Smoot. (Wisdom, W. Jackson)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2023 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Trial will be set during the June 2023 civil term, with Jury Selection set for 6/6/2023 08:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Discovery cutoff 12/16/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2022. Motions due by 1/20/2023. Position Regarding Settlement due by 12/23/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Scheduling Conference held on 7/28/2022. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (tgw)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be referred to the United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P.73. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/27/22. (tgw)
July 26, 2022 Filing 72 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Joel Galarza.. (Starzyk, Michael)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order setting telephonic scheduling conference. ( Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson.) See call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/22/22. (cmj)
July 19, 2022 Filing 70 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. (Price, Ann)
July 18, 2022 REFERRAL OF #69 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Nelson. (cmj)
July 15, 2022 Filing 69 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Starzyk, Michael)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #66 Disclosure Statement filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/15/2022. (ctn)
July 13, 2022 Filing 67 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #66 filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
July 13, 2022 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. (Price, Ann)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ENDORSED ORDER granting #62 Joint MOTION to Amend #57 Preliminary Scheduling Order. The deadline for the parties to meet and file a report pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) is extended to 7/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/11/2022. (ctn)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ENDORSED ORDER granting #63 MOTION for Michael Golden and Gilbert Nwaopara to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Michael Golden and Gilbert O. Nwaopara terminated as counsel of record for Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/11/2022. (ctn)
July 8, 2022 Filing 63 MOTION for Michael Golden and Gilbert Nwaopara to Withdraw as Attorney NOA Bryan Taylor filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. (Price, Ann)
July 8, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #63 MOTION for Michael Golden and Gilbert Nwaopara to Withdraw as Attorney NOA Bryan Taylor Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
July 8, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #62 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order #57 Preliminary Scheduling Order Agreed Joint Motion to Amend Preliminary Scheduling Order Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
July 7, 2022 Filing 62 Joint MOTION to Amend #57 Preliminary Scheduling Order filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. (Price, Ann) Modified on 7/8/2022 (cmj).
July 7, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Abrams Price on behalf of Texas Windstorm Insurance Association (Price, Ann)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ENDORSED ORDER granting #59 MOTION and APPLICATION for Ann A Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/29/2022. (ctn)
June 29, 2022 Filing 59 MOTION and APPLICATION for Ann A Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3032549, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. (Price, Ann)
June 29, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #59 MOTION and APPLICATION for Ann A Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenL Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
June 26, 2022 Filing 58 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #52 filed by One Call Claims, LLC and Corporate Disclosure Statement #50 filed by One Call Claims, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/17/22. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #52 , #50 Disclosure Statements filed by One Call Claims, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/17/2022. (ctn)
June 17, 2022 Filing 55 Case re-assigned to Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
June 16, 2022 Filing 54 Case Reassigned. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (cjr) Modified on 6/16/2022 (cjr).
March 4, 2022 Filing 53 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #52 filed by One Call Claims, LLC (Cassady, William)
March 3, 2022 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant One Call Claims, LLC. (Wisdom, W. Jackson)
February 22, 2022 Filing 51 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #50 filed by One Call Claims, LLC. Upon review, it is determined that it is necessary to require Cratos Solutions, LLC to provide a list of its members not later than March 3, 2022. (Cassady, William)
February 22, 2022 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants One Call Claims, LLC, Cratos Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cratos Solutions, LLC for One Call Claims, LLC.. (Wisdom, W. Jackson)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order, ( Disclosure Statement Due 2/24/2022.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement Form) (eec)
December 15, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE by Kathrine Carpenter FLSA Action Consent Form (Starzyk, Michael)
December 9, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE by Vicki Wimberly FLSA Action Consent Form (Starzyk, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Michael J. Golden, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/23/21. (Cassady, William)
September 21, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael J Golden to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael J Golden Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2877432, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. (Golden, Michael)
August 13, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE by One Call Claims, LLC of Filing Amended Disclosures (Wisdom, W. Jackson)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge) (eec)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENDORSED ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor W. Jackson Wisdom, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/9/21. (Cassady, William)
August 3, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION and APPLICATION for W. Jackson Wisdom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2848988, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by One Call Claims, LLC, Kelly Smoot, Kristi Smoot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wisdom, W. Jackson)
July 29, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian David Rosenthal on behalf of Joel Galarza (Rosenthal, Ian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 39 Notice of Filing Disclosures filed by One Call Claims, LLC. (Kirkpatrick, R.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Mark Kirkpatrick on behalf of One Call Claims, LLC (Kirkpatrick, R.)
July 12, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Joel Galarza re: #36 Order, Set Deadlines (Starzyk, Michael)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order re: Status Conference, ( Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/12/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/2/2021. (eec)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Savannah Mary Warner, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/14/21. (Cassady, William)
June 11, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION and APPLICATION for Savannah M. Warner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2821983, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Joel Galarza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Warner, Savannah)
June 8, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/8/2021. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srd)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/2/21. (Cassady, William)
June 1, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct 30 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, filed by Joel Galarza. (Starzyk, Michael)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Michael A. Starzyk, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above entitled cause. Even though this motion has been granted, it appears that the applicant did not correctly and completely respond to Question 4 on the application asking for information about the State in which he is authorized to practice law. See 4(c)&(d). These responses are inconsistent with the response to Question 5. Applicant shall supplement the application not later than June 11, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/1/21. (Cassady, William)
May 27, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael A. Starzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2814956, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Joel Galarza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Starzyk, Michael)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order, ( Status Conference, BY TELEPHONE, set for 6/8/2021 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/8/2021. (eec)
May 24, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
May 21, 2021 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00808. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING #20 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' #8 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association and #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Kristi Smoot, Kelly Smoot, One Call Claims, LLC. ORDER that this case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Golden on behalf of Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. Attorney Michael J. Golden added to party Texas Windstorm Insurance Association(pty:dft) (Golden, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 23 OBJECTION to #20 Report and Recommendations by Joel Galarza.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 22 Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Joel Galarza, re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Kristi Smoot, Defendant Kelly Smoot, Defendant One Call Claims, LLC (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 21 Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Joel Galarza, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Texas Windstorm Insurance Association (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Joel Galarza and #16 Motion for Leave to File Document filed by Joel Galarza, and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the United States Magistrate Judge re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association and #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Kristi Smoot, Kelly Smoot, One Call Claims, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #8 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue; #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer; #13 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply; #16 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Regarding The One Call Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Joel Galarza, re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Regarding The One Call Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Plaintiff Joel Galarza (Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by One Call Claims, LLC, Kelly Smoot, Kristi Smoot, re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Kristi Smoot, Defendant Kelly Smoot, Defendant One Call Claims, LLC Defendants One Call Claims, LLC, Kristi Smoot, and Kelly Smoot's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Their Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss or Transfer; Motion for Leave (Wisdom, W.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by One Call Claims, LLC, Kelly Smoot, Kristi Smoot, re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Regarding The One Call Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Plaintiff Joel Galarza (Wisdom, W.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 21, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: referred #16 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Regarding The One Call Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer . Referral Judge: Susan Hightower. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #16 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, (Dkt. 16), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Regarding The One Call Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer by Joel Galarza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 Miscellaneous Objection to #14 Reply to Response to Motion, by Joel Galarza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #8 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Texas Windstorm Insurance Association's Motion to Dismiss, (Dkt. 8), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #10 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants One Call Claims, LLC, Kelly Smoot, Kristi Smoot's Motion to Dismiss, (Dkt. 10), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #13 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Objection and Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, (Dkt. 13), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 14, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: referred #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer, #13 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply, #8 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue. Referral Judge: Susan Hightower. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by One Call Claims, LLC, Kelly Smoot, Kristi Smoot, re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Kristi Smoot, Defendant Kelly Smoot, Defendant One Call Claims, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wisdom, W.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 Miscellaneous Objection to #11 Response in Support of Motion, and Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Joel Galarza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Starzyk, Michael) Modified on 10/6/2020 (td). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Joel Galarza, re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Kristi Smoot, Defendant Kelly Smoot, Defendant One Call Claims, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Texas Windstorm Insurance Association (Boulette, Jason) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer by One Call Claims, LLC, Kelly Smoot, Kristi Smoot. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wisdom, W.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Joel Galarza, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Texas Windstorm Insurance Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boulette, Jason) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Galarza. One Call Claims, LLC served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Galarza. Texas Windstorm Insurance Association served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Galarza. Kelly Smoot served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Galarza. Kristi Smoot served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to One Call Claims, LLC, Kelly Smoot, Kristi Smoot, Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joel Galarza. (Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13819456), filed by Joel Galarza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Starzyk, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
July 31, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joel Galarza. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]
July 31, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galarza v. One Call Claims, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Smoot
Represented By: W. Jackson Wisdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Call Claims, LLC
Represented By: W. Jackson Wisdom
Represented By: R. Mark Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Windstorm Insurance Association
Represented By: Gilbert O. Nwaopara
Represented By: Jason Scott Boulette
Represented By: Michael J. Golden
Represented By: Michael Golden
Represented By: Ann Abrams Price
Represented By: Bryan McDaniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Smoot
Represented By: W. Jackson Wisdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Galarza
Represented By: Michael Starzyk
Represented By: Savannah Mary Warner
Represented By: Ian David Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?