Grimes v. Noe
Petitioner: Tony Eugene Grimes
Respondent: Guy Noe
Case Number: 1:2021cv00255
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Slate Poe on behalf of Guy Noe (Poe, Beth)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Alabama Attorney General served on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (cmj)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Directing Clerk to Serve copy of 2254 petition and order on Respondent and Attorney General. Respondent to answer within 60 days of service on AG as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/28/21. (copy mailed to petitioner) (Certified mail Warden Guy Noe 70200640000081036795; Alabama Attorney General 70200640000081036801) (cmj)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #5 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File In Forma Pauperis Documents in light of the Court's Order granting Petitioner's motion. See Doc. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/25/21. (lto) Copy mailed to Plaintiff (srd).
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to file In Forma Pauperis Documents filed by Tony Eugene Grimes. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (meh)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Petitioner's Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/24/21. (lto)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tony Eugene Grimes. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (srd)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tony Eugene Grimes. Petitioner is ORDERED to either pay the filing fee or file a Motion for IFP byr 6/17/2021. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner the IFP form.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 05/27/2021. (srd) Copies to Petitioner.
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tony Eugene Grimes. (srd) Referred to Judge Murray (PSU).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Noe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Guy Noe
Represented By: Beth Slate Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tony Eugene Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?