Cooper v. Lister et al
Plaintiff: Randolph Clay Cooper
Defendant: Shawn Lucas Lister, Aaron Glass, Zach Kuiken and Town of Loxley, Alabama
Case Number: 1:2021cv00324
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff may file and serve his amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/17/21. (Cassady, William)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Randolph Clay Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint) (Isphording, Brian)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Randolph Clay Cooper. Town of Loxley, Alabama waiver sent on 7/22/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Isphording, Brian)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Randolph Clay Cooper. Zach Kuiken waiver sent on 7/22/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Isphording, Brian)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Randolph Clay Cooper. Aaron Glass waiver sent on 7/22/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Isphording, Brian)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Randolph Clay Cooper. Shawn Lucas Lister waiver sent on 7/22/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Isphording, Brian)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Randolph Clay Cooper re #3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge (Isphording, Brian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to The Town of Loxley, Alabama on 07-22-2021 by Randolph Clay Cooper. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2021. (Isphording, Brian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Zach Kuiken on 07-22-2021 by Randolph Clay Cooper. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2021. (Isphording, Brian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Aaron Glass on 07-22-2021 by Randolph Clay Cooper. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2021. (Isphording, Brian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Shawn Lucas Lister on 07-22-2021 by Randolph Clay Cooper. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2021. (Isphording, Brian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Randolph Clay Cooper against Aaron Glass, Zach Kuiken, Shawn Lucas Lister, Town of Loxley, Alabama ( Receipt number Acct No 3548419, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by Randolph Clay Cooper. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/20/2021. (Isphording, Brian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2842734, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Randolph Clay Cooper. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/20/2021. (Isphording, Brian) Modified on 7/22/2021 (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Lister et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Clay Cooper
Represented By: Brian C. Isphording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Lucas Lister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Kuiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Loxley, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?