Silvaris Corporation v. Craig et al
Plaintiff: Silvaris Corporation d/b/a LowGradeLumber and Silvaris Corporation doing business as LowGradeLumber
Defendant: Joseph Craig, Bryan Busby and Shoreline Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00332
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re: Dft Busby's #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Plf is to show cause on or before 9/22/2021, why the motion should not be granted. Dft has until 9/29/2021 to file any reply it wishes to file. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/1/21. (tot)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 Brief filed by Bryan Busby re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bryan Busby. (Coker, Laura)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bryan Busby. (Coker, Laura)
August 31, 2021 REFERRAL OF #9 Motion to Dismiss and, #10 Brief in Support to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #7 Disclosure Statement filed by Silvaris Corporation. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/10/2021. (ctn)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Silvaris Corporation. (Heilman, Michael)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Bryan Busby, Joseph Craig, Shoreline Products, Inc. ( Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, DENYING Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; DIRECTING Plaintiff to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order along with the motion for preliminary injunction; and ORDERING Defendants to file responses to the motion for preliminary injunction concurrent with their respective answers or other responsive pleadings. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/28/2021. (mab)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, GRANTING #2 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Heilman. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/28/2021. (mab)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Silvaris Corporation to Defendants Joseph Craig, Bryan Busby and Shoreline Products, Inc. (Ortega, Juan)
July 23, 2021 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Silvaris Corporation. (Referred to J/Moorer on 7/26/21) (tot)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael A. Heilman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2844000, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Silvaris Corporation d/b/a LowGradeLumber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Ortega, Juan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction against Bryan Busby, Joseph Craig, Shoreline Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2843993, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Silvaris Corporation d/b/a LowGradeLumber. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Ortega, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvaris Corporation v. Craig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvaris Corporation d/b/a LowGradeLumber
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvaris Corporation doing business as LowGradeLumber
Represented By: Kyle T. Smith
Represented By: Michael A. Heilman
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Busby
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Represented By: Laura M. Coker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoreline Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?