Walsh v. Alliance Mechanical Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor Martin J Walsh and Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: Alliance Mechanical Solutions, LLC and Alliance Mechanical Solutions LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00375
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alliance Mechanical Solutions LLC. Alliance Mechanical Solutions LLC waiver sent on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (Lancaster, William)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alliance Mechanical Solutions LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Martin J. Walsh as to Alliance Mechanical Solutions LLC. (Miller, Daniel) Modified on 9/24/2021 (srd).
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy K. Fisher on behalf of Martin J. Walsh (Fisher, Jeremy)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Injunctive Relief Sought against Alliance Mechanical Solutions, LLC ( IFP.), filed by Martin J Walsh. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix) (Miller, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Alliance Mechanical Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor Martin J Walsh
Represented By: Daniel Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Jeremy K. Fisher
Represented By: Daniel Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Mechanical Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Mechanical Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?