Mitchell v. State of Texas
Plaintiff: Virgil Mitchell
Defendant: State of Texas
Case Number: 1:2021cv00376
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 19313297786 (mab)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order, Plf is to pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees by 9/13/2021. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plf a copy of the Court's current form for a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/30/21. (copy mailed to Plf w/form on 8/31/21) (tot)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Texas filed by Virgil Mitchell. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/23/2021. (Referred to MJ/Bivins(PSU) on 8/27/21) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?