Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority v. Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile et al
Plaintiff: Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority
Defendant: Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile doing business as Mobile Area Water & Sewer System and US Dept of Agriculture Rural Development
Case Number: 1:2021cv00400
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER and Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: A status conference was conducted on November 8, 2021 with counsel for all parties in attendance. Based on the representations of counsel, counsel for the parties (with the exception of USDARD) are directed to file, by November 15, 2021, a joint statement notifying the Court of the status of a cessation agreement for the duration of this litigation. Counsel for the parties, (with the exception of USDARD) are further directed to confer and to file, by November 22, 2021, a joint Rule 26(f) report, along with a joint proposed protective order addressing the exchange of confidential documents. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mpp) [DCR Recording] Copies to counsel
November 5, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile and US Dept of Agriculture Rural Development, filed by Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E) (Douglas, Danielle)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order withdrawing preliminary scheduling order (doc. 16) and setting a status conference. ( Status Conference set for 11/8/2021 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/29/21. (cmj)
October 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Walker on behalf of Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority (Walker, David)
October 29, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Status Conference held on 10/29/2021. Court Reporter Cheryl Powell. (mbp)
October 28, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley E. Dean on behalf of Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile (Dean, Bradley)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order setting status hearing. ( Status Hearing set for 10/29/2021 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock.) Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 10/25/21. (cmj)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (WITHDRAWN PER DOC. 20) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/9/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/25/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj) Modified on 10/29/2021 (cmj).
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile. (Wettermark, Lawrence)
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile's Answer is due by 10/22/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 10/06/2021. (jil)
October 6, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Judge Beaverstock. (srd)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile. (Wettermark, Lawrence)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Attorney. (Ross, Jay)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Attorney (for USDA) (Ross, Jay) Modified on 9/23/2021 (cmj).
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Department of Agriculture served on 9/20/2021 (Ross, Jay) Modified on 9/23/2021 (cmj).
September 23, 2021 Answer due from US Dept of Agriculture Rural Development on 11/19/2021 (cmj)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority. Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021 (Ross, Jay)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to US Dept of Agriculture Rural Development, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority US Attorney and Attorney General (Ross, Jay)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Elysees Douglas on behalf of Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority (Douglas, Danielle)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Service Order entered 9/16/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 11/1/2021.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 9/16/21. (cmj)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile, US Dept of Agriculture Rural Development. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority (Ross, Jay)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Ross, Jay)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile, US Dept of Agriculture Rural Development ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2874675, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E) (Ross, Jay) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2021: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).
September 16, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority v. Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile County Water, Sewer & Fire Protection Authority
Represented By: Jay M. Ross
Represented By: Aubrey Patrick Dungan
Represented By: Danielle Elysees Douglas
Represented By: Todd David Engelhardt
Represented By: David F. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Water & Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile doing business as Mobile Area Water & Sewer System
Represented By: Lawrence M. Wettermark
Represented By: Bradley E. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Dept of Agriculture Rural Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?