Parker et al v. Exterior Restorations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John H. Parker and Bryan Maisel Homes, LLC
Defendant: Exterior Restorations, Inc., Burl Barnett, Sto Corp, Wall And Ceiling Solutions, LLC and Capitol Materials, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00425
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order GRANTING #21 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Wall And Ceiling Solutions, LLC. Sur-reply due by 11/29/2021, as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/22/2021. (meh)
November 22, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #21 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to Judge Steele. (meh)
November 19, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Wall And Ceiling Solutions, LLC. (Benton, Thomas)
November 19, 2021 REFERRAL OF #20 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Steele. (meh)
November 18, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion #13 to Remand filed by Bryan Maisel Homes, LLC, John H. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Daniels, Charles)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order GRANTING #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time filed by John H. Parker, Bryan Maisel Homes, LLC. Reply in support of the Motion to Remand #18 due NLT 11/19/2021. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/11/2021. (meh)
November 10, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Remand filed by Bryan Maisel Homes, LLC, John H. Parker. (Daniels, Charles)
November 8, 2021 REFERRAL OF #15 Response to Motion, #17 Response to Motion, #16 Joinder in Motion to Judge Steele. (cmj)
November 5, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re: #13 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Brief in Support JOINDER IN DEFENDANT WALL AND CEILING SOLUTIONS, LLC'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO REMAND filed by Burl Barnett, Exterior Restorations, Inc.. (Minopoli, Bonnie)
November 5, 2021 Filing 16 Joinder in MOTION re #13 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Brief in Support . (Gaddy, Jeremy)
November 5, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re: #13 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Brief in Support filed by Wall And Ceiling Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Benton, Thomas)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing re: #13 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Brief in Support filed by John H. Parker, Bryan Maisel Homes, LLC. Responses due by 11/5/2021; Replies due by 11/12/2021; Motion to be taken under submission on 11/12/2021. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/26/21. (cmj)
October 25, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Brief in Support to Judge Steele (cmj)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Brief in Support filed by Bryan Maisel Homes, LLC, John H. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Daniels, Charles)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge William H. Steele and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mpp)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (mpp) Copies to counsel
October 4, 2021 REFERRAL OF #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Capitol Materials, Inc.. (Gaddy, Jeremy)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Gaal on behalf of Wall And Ceiling Solutions, LLC (Gaal, Richard)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Burl Barnett, Exterior Restorations, Inc.. (Minopoli, Bonnie)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Warren Butler on behalf of Burl Barnett, Exterior Restorations, Inc. (Butler, M.)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 Consent to MOTION For Removal filed by Exterior Restorations, Inc., Burl Barnett. (Minopoli, Bonnie)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Capitol Materials, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Gaddy, Jeremy)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Consent to MOTION Removal filed by Sto Corp. (Bergquist, John)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Sto Corp. (Bergquist, John)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Wall And Ceiling Solutions, LLC. (Benton, Thomas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2881469, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wall And Ceiling Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F) (Benton, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker et al v. Exterior Restorations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. Parker
Represented By: Charles William Daniels, Jr.
Represented By: Christine Burns
Represented By: Kenneth Bryant Hitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Maisel Homes, LLC
Represented By: Charles William Daniels, Jr.
Represented By: Christine Burns
Represented By: Kenneth Bryant Hitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exterior Restorations, Inc.
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Represented By: Bonnie Branum Minopoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Barnett
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Represented By: Bonnie Branum Minopoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sto Corp
Represented By: John M. Bergquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wall And Ceiling Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Gaal
Represented By: Thomas Hart Benton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Gaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?