Potts v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: William Potts and William Joshua Potts
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00466
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cjr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2021: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (cjr).
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/30/2021. (Copy mailed to Plf) (cjr) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/30/2021) (cjr).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to serve summons, along with the amended complaint, on the Dft as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/29/2021. (Copy mailed to Plf) (cjr)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Joshua Potts. (Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray(PSU) on 11/24/21). (tot)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by William Joshua Potts. (Referred to MJ/Murray(PSU) on 11/24/21) (tot)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order, Plf's #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as set out. Plf is to file an amended for complaint & a new motion to proceed without prepayment of fees on or before 11/22/2021 as set out. The Clerk is to send forms for a Pro Se Form 13 & a motion to proceed without prepayment to Plf. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/2/21. (copy mailed to Plf w/forms on 11/2/21) (tot)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Joshua Potts. (Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray(PSU) on 10/29/21) (tot)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by William Joshua Potts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Referred to MJ/Murray(PSU) on 10/29/21) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potts v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Joshua Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?