Distributed Ledger, Inc. v. New Green Network LLC et al
Plaintiff: Distributed Ledger, Inc.
Defendant: New Green Network LLC, Milwaukee SEO LLC and Scott Offord
Case Number: 1:2021cv00490
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order re hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 01/24/2022 is changed to 9:00 a.m. as set out. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 01/04/2022. (srd)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order GRANTING #18 MOTION to Continue Hearing and Request for In-Person Settlement Conference filed by Scott Offord, Milwaukee SEO LLC, New Green Network LLC. Settlement Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement statement NLT 4:00 p.m. on 1/18/2022 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/16/2021. (srd)
December 15, 2021 Filing 24 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #21 filed by Milwaukee SEO LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #19 filed by Scott Offord, Corporate Disclosure Statement #20 filed by New Green Network LLC. Review of the Statements does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (khc)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order GRANTING #18 MOTION to Continue Hearing and Request for In-Person Settlement Conference filed by Scott Offord, Milwaukee SEO LLC, New Green Network LLC. Motion Hearing reset for 1/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Kristi K. DuBose as set out. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/14/2021. (srd)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #21 , #20 Disclosure Statements filed by Milwaukee SEO LLC and New Green Network LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/14/2021. (ctn)
December 14, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Milwaukee SEO LLC, Scott Offord, New Green Network LLC identifying Other Affiliate Scott Offord, Other Affiliate New Green Network LLC for Milwaukee SEO LLC.. (Pryor, Caroline)
December 14, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants New Green Network LLC, Milwaukee SEO LLC, Scott Offord identifying Other Affiliate Scott Offord, Other Affiliate Milwaukee SEO LLC for New Green Network LLC.. (Pryor, Caroline)
December 14, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Continue Hearing and Request for In-Person Settlement Conference to Judge DuBose. (srd)
December 14, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Continue Hearing and Request for In-Person Settlement Conference Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (srd)
December 13, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Scott Offord, Scott Offord identifying Other Affiliate Scott Offord for Scott Offord.. (Pryor, Caroline)
December 13, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Continue Hearing and Request for In-Person Settlement Conference filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Mtn to Continue Hearing) (Pryor, Caroline)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 MOTION and APPLICATION for Gary Zhao to Appear Pro Hac Vice for New Green Network LLC, Milwaukee SEO LLC, and Scott Offord. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/13/2021. (ctn)
December 13, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION and APPLICATION for Gary Zhao to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (srd)
December 13, 2021 REFERRAL OF #16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge DuBose. (srd)
December 10, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Milwaukee SEO LLC, New Green Network LLC, Scott Offord. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 D) (Pryor, Caroline)
December 10, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION and APPLICATION for Gary Zhao to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2920808, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Zhao, Gary)
December 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Cross Ryan on behalf of Milwaukee SEO LLC, New Green Network LLC, Scott Offord (Ryan, Sarah)
December 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Thomason Pryor on behalf of Milwaukee SEO LLC, New Green Network LLC, Scott Offord (Pryor, Caroline)
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Scott Offord #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and #10 Order. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re: #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Distributed Ledger, Inc. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended disclosure statement NLT 11/30/2021 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/23/2021. (srd) Copy to parties.
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order re: #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Distributed Ledger, Inc. Defendants shall file their response on or before 12/10/2021. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/23/2021. (srd)
November 22, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Judge DuBose. (srd)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Distributed Ledger, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Green, Dennis)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 MOTION and APPLICATION for R. Joshua Koch, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Distributed Ledger, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/16/2021. (ctn)
November 16, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION and APPLICATION for R. Joshua Koch, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson.
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION and APPLICATION for R. Joshua Koch, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2907537, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Distributed Ledger, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Federal Certificate of Good Standing, #2 LA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing) (Koch, R.)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: #1 Verified Complaint for Temporary RestrainingOrder, Preliminary Injunction, and Damages filed by Distributed Ledger, Inc. The Court will await further substantive argument from DLI before setting a hearing as set out. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/15/2021. (srd)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #4 Disclosure Statement filed by Distributed Ledger, Inc. The disclosure statement cites, and tracks the language of, only Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. This is insufficient because the disclosure requirements of S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 are broader than those of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. See S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1(b) ("The Disclosure Statement shall identify the represented entity's general nature and shall identify all parents, subsidiaries, partners, members, managers, trustees, affiliates, and similarly related persons and entities."); Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."). Distributed Ledger, Inc. is ORDERED to file an amended disclosure statement that certifies disclosure required by S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than Thurs. 11/18/2021 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/12/2021. (ctn)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Distributed Ledger, Inc.. (Green, Dennis)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Distributed Ledger, Inc. is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (required of "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (required of "nongovernmental corporate" parties) no later than Thurs. 11/18/2021 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/12/2021. (ctn)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Milwaukee SEO LLC, New Green Network LLC, Scott Offord. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Damages against Milwaukee SEO LLC, New Green Network LLC, Scott Offord ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2906095, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Distributed Ledger, Inc.. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons) (Green, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Distributed Ledger, Inc. v. New Green Network LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Distributed Ledger, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis D. Green, Jr.
Represented By: R. Joshua Koch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Green Network LLC
Represented By: Gary Zhao
Represented By: Caroline Thomason Pryor
Represented By: Sarah Cross Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee SEO LLC
Represented By: Gary Zhao
Represented By: Caroline Thomason Pryor
Represented By: Sarah Cross Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Offord
Represented By: Gary Zhao
Represented By: Caroline Thomason Pryor
Represented By: Sarah Cross Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?