Davis Construction Company, LLC v. Merchants Transfer Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Davis Construction Company, LLC
Defendant: Merchants Transfer Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00550
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Newell on behalf of Merchants Transfer Co., Inc. (Newell, Mark)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Allison R. Coln to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/3/2022. (clr)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION and APPLICATION for Allison R. Coln to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Allison R. Coln Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2930890, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Davis Construction Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Admission Form) (Colon, Allison)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/14/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/3/22. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
January 3, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION and APPLICATION for Allison R. Coln to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Allison R. Coln Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Peter-Raymond Graffeo to Appear Pro Hac Vice; GRANTING #5 Motion for Lloyd N. Shields to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/30/2021. (clr)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Davis Construction Company, LLC. Merchants Transfer Co., Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service) (Graffeo, Peter-Raymond)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION and APPLICATION for Lloyd N. Shields to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2929457, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Davis Construction Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appellate Rules Application and Certificate of Good Standing) (Shields, Lloyd)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION and APPLICATION for Peter-Raymond Graffeo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2929330, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Davis Construction Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appellate Rules Application and Good Standing) (Graffeo, Peter-Raymond)
December 29, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION and APPLICATION for Lloyd N. Shields to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (cmj)
December 29, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION and APPLICATION for Peter-Raymond Graffeo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (cmj)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This order entered prematurely and amended at doc. 8) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/11/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/28/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj) Modified on 1/3/2022 (cmj).
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Merchants Transfer Co., Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merchants Transfer Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2928351, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Davis Construction Company, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Motion to Enroll Pro Hac Vice, #4 Supplement Applications Pro Hac Vice Admission, #5 Supplement Summons) (Shields, Lloyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis Construction Company, LLC v. Merchants Transfer Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davis Construction Company, LLC
Represented By: Lloyd N. Shields
Represented By: Allison Raquel Colon
Represented By: Peter-Raymond Graffeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Transfer Co., Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?