Townsend v. McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC
Plaintiff: Neal C. Townsend and Neal Townsend
Defendant: McClenny, Moseley & Associates, PLLC, McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, James M. McClenny, John Z. Moseley and Adam T. Walton
Counter Defendant: Townsend Law, LLC, Law Offices of Daniel R. Sanders LLC and Daniel R Sanders
Case Number: 1:2022cv00006
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 REFERRAL OF #78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Judge Moorer. (tot)
March 2, 2022 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #75 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Law Offices of Daniel R. Sanders LLC, Daniel R Sanders. (Cozart, Stephen)
March 2, 2022 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Marshall Cozart on behalf of Law Offices of Daniel R. Sanders LLC, Daniel R Sanders (Cozart, Stephen)
March 2, 2022 REFERRAL OF #76 Response to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot)
February 28, 2022 Filing 76 RESPONSE to #63 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Neal Townsend. (Jackson, Matthew)
February 28, 2022 Filing 75 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff Neal Townsend's First Amended Complaint, Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims #18 Amended Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Daniel R Sanders, Townsend Law, LLC, Law Offices of Daniel R. Sanders LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Neal Townsend by McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC. (Newman, J.)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order re: Motions for Leave to Seal Documents (Docs. #2 , #8 , #13 , #16 , #20 , #22 , #50 ). The parties are DIRECTED to confer with each other to determine if there is a lesser means to protect confidential information or if not, provide the Court a supplemental brief as set out. The parties shall file a joint status report &/or the supplemental brief(s) on or before 3/15/2022. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/25/22. (tot)
February 24, 2022 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Z. Moseley, McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, James M. McClenny, Adam T. Walton. Daniel R Sanders served on 2/18/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 (Newman, J.)
February 24, 2022 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Z. Moseley, McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, James M. McClenny, Adam T. Walton. Law Offices of Daniel R. Sanders LLC served on 2/18/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 (Newman, J.)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER & PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #69 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED as set out. The hearing previously scheduled for 3/7/22 on Plf's #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is CANCELLED, & all deadlines related to said hearing are VACATED. The Clerk is ORDERED to remit to Plf a check in the amount of $1,500.00 as set out. Plf's #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Dfts' #48 MOTION to Dissolve #33 Temporary Restraining Order are both DENIED as moot as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/23/22. (tot)
February 23, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Ryan Jackson on behalf of Townsend Law, LLC (Jackson, Matthew)
February 23, 2022 Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by James M. McClenny, McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, John Z. Moseley, Adam T. Walton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A Proposed Order) (Newman, J.)
February 23, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #69 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
February 17, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Settlement Conference held on 2/17/2022. Case did not settle. (mpp) Modified on 2/18/2022 (mpp).
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the Preliminary Injunction hearing in this matter is RESCHEDULED for 3/7/2022 at 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. The #33 Temporary Restraining Order shall expire at 11:59 p.m. on the 7th day of March, 2022. All other requirements and deadlines as set forth in the #60 Order issued on February 6, 2022 shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/11/2022. (mab)
February 10, 2022 Filing 67 Summons Issued on Third-Party Complaint as to Law Offices of Daniel R. Sanders LLC, Daniel R Sanders, Townsend Law, LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot) Modified on 2/10/2022 (tot).
February 9, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC (Newman, J.)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order re: Dft McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC's #63 Partial MOTION to Dismiss. Plf is to show cause on or before 2/28/2022 why the motion should not be granted. Dft has until 3/7/2022 to file any reply it wishes to file. The motion shall be taken under submission on that date as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/8/22. (tot)
February 8, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #63 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
February 7, 2022 Filing 64 ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS against Neal Townsend, Townsend Law, LLC, Law Offices of Daniel R. Sanders LLC, Daniel R Sanders, filed by McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC. (Newman, J.) Modified on 2/8/2022 (tot).
February 7, 2022 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss filed by McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC. (Newman, J.)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order, Settlement Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins as set out. Counsel for each party is to be submit a confidential settlement statement to chambers by 5:00 pm on 2/14/22 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/7/22. (tot)
February 7, 2022 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion #53 for Sanctions filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Jackson, Matthew)
February 7, 2022 REFERRAL OF #58 Response in Opposition to #53 Motion for Sanctions due to Defendants' Disobedience of Court Order (Doc. 45); and #59 Reply to Judge Bivins. (mab)
February 7, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Discovery Hearing held on 2/7/2022. Settlement Conference set for 02/17/2022 at 9:30 am. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srd)
February 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order, GRANTING #57 Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order, Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and Reset Deadlines; EXTENDING TRO until 11:59 p.m. on 3/8/2022; MODIFYING TRO as set out in order; CONTINUING preliminary injunction hearing until 1:30 p.m. on 3/8/2022; VACATING current deadline to exchange witness and exhibit lists; and EXTENDING deadline for Plaintiff to respond to motion to dissolve TRO to five days before the new preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/6/2022. (mab)
February 6, 2022 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION for Sanctions due to Defendants' Disobedience of Court Order (Doc. 45) filed by James M. McClenny, McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, John Z. Moseley, Adam T. Walton. (Fry, Megan)
February 4, 2022 Filing 57 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing, Extend TRO, Modify TRO, and Reset Deadlines filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Matthew)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order re: Plf's #53 MOTION for Sanctions. Discovery Hearing, via video conferencing, set for 2/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. The Clerk will provide instructions for the parties to connect to the video conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/4/22. (tot)
February 4, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Blair Newman, Jr on behalf of James M. McClenny, McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, John Z. Moseley, Adam T. Walton (Newman, J.)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order re: Dfts' #48 Verified MOTION to Dissolve #33 Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum of Law in Support. Plf shall file his response to the motion on or before 2/7/2022 as set out. Parties are encouraged to coordinate with the Mag. Judge, & should they wish to mediate this matter, it may be possible to do so prior to the scheduled preliminary injunction hearing on 2/9/22. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/4/22. (tot)
February 4, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION for Sanctions due to Defendants' Disobedience of Court Order (Doc. 45) filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Hearing Transcript), #2 Exhibit 2 (Walton Email with PDFs)) (Jackson, Matthew)
February 4, 2022 REFERRAL OF #52 REPLY to #42 Defendants' Response in Opposition to #19 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Judge Moorer. (mab)
February 4, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #53 MOTION for Sanctions referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tot)
February 3, 2022 Filing 52 REPLY to #42 Defendants' Response in Opposition to #19 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Neal Townsend. (Jackson, Matthew) Modified on 2/4/2022 (mab).
February 3, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Matthew)
February 3, 2022 Filing 49 Evidentiary Material in Support of #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Neal Townsend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Townsend Declaration with Exhibits)) (Jackson, Matthew)
February 3, 2022 Filing 48 Verified MOTION to Dissolve #33 Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by McClenny Mosley & Associates, PLLC, James M. McClenny, John Z. Moseley, & Adam T. Walton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resignation Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Departure Letter to Clients, #3 Exhibit 3 - Townsend's Email to MMA, #4 Exhibit 4 - Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Demand Letter 1.14.2022, #6 Exhibit 6 - MMA's Form Letter to Departing Clients, #7 Exhibit 7 - MMA's Form Letter to Affected Clients, #8 Exhibit 8 - MMA's File Transfer Emails 1.25.2022, #9 Exhibit 9 - MMA's File Transfer Emails 1.26.2022, #10 Exhibit 10 - MMA's Summary Chart of Affected Clients, #11 Exhibit 11 - File Transfer Emails 1.27.2022, #12 Exhibit 12 - Email from MMA Client requesting Immediate Contact) (Fry, Megan) Modified on 2/4/2022 (tot).
February 3, 2022 REFERRAL OF #49 Evidentiary Material in Support of #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Judge Moorer. (mab)
February 3, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #50 MOTION for leave to File Unredacted Declaration and Exhibits Under Seal Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
February 3, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #48 Verified MOTION to Dissolve #33 Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum of Law in Support ; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
February 1, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake T. Richardson on behalf of Neal Townsend (Richardson, Blake)
February 1, 2022 Filing 46 Joint Notice of Conferral Regarding Mediation, (Branning, Jeremy)
February 1, 2022 REFERRAL OF #46 Joint Notice of Conferral Regarding Mediation to Judges Moorer & Bivins. (tot)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order **text only** As discussed during the discovery conference conducted on January 28, 2022, and agreed to by the parties, expeditated discovery will be limited to the specific categories of information discussed during the conference. Discovery responses are due on February 3, 2022. To the extent discovery requests have not been served, they must be served by 5:00 p.m. today. The parties shall file, by no later than February 4, 2022, a list identifying the witnesses and exhibits they expect to utilize for the preliminary injunction hearing on February 9, 2022. Finally, counsel for the parties shall confer with their respective clients, regarding mediation, and shall file a joint notification, by no later than February 1, 2022, advising the Court whether they have agreed to mediate this case, and if so, the name of the agreed upon mediator, if applicable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/28/22. (mpp) Copies to counsel
January 28, 2022 Filing 43 Plaintiff's Proposed Expedited Discovery/Evidentiary Material for Reference During 1/28/2022 Virtual Hearing before Hon. Magistrate Judge Bivins filed by Neal Townsend re: #19 Motion for Expedited Discovery in Advance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Expedited Discovery to MMA), #2 Exhibit 2 (Proposed Expedited Discovery to McClenny), #3 Exhibit 3 (Proposed Expedited Discovery to Moseley), #4 Exhibit 4 (Proposed Expedited Discovery to Walton)) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 28, 2022 REFERRAL OF #43 Plaintiff's Proposed Expedited Discovery/Evidentiary Material for Reference During 1/28/2022 Virtual Hearing before Hon. Magistrate Judge Bivins to Judge Bivins. (mab)
January 28, 2022 REFERRAL OF #42 Response in Opposition to #19 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Expedited Discovery in Advance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing to Judge Moorer and Judge Bivins (mab)
January 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Video Status Conference held on 1/28/2022. Order to follow. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (mpp)
January 27, 2022 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Expedited Discovery in Advance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Advance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by James M. McClenny, McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, John Z. Moseley, Adam T. Walton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Moseley, #2 Exhibit 1 - Townsend's Resignation Letter - 1.3.2022, #3 Exhibit 2 - Townsend's Departure Letter to Clients 1.4.2022, #4 Exhibit 3 - Townsend's Email to MMA 1.8.2022, #5 Exhibit 4 - Townsend's Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - Townsend's Demand Letter 1.14.2022, #7 Exhibit 6 - MMA's Form Letter to Departing Clients, #8 Exhibit 7 - MMA's Form Letter to Affected Clients, #9 Exhibit 8 - MMA's File Transfer Emails 1.25.2022, #10 Exhibit 9 - MMA's File Transfer Emails 1.26.2022, #11 Exhibit 10 - MMA's Summary Chart of Affected Clients (Updated - COB 1.26.2022), #12 Exhibit 11 - File Transfer Email 1.27.2022, #13 Exhibit 12 - Example of MMA's Termination Fee Provision Contract, #14 Exhibit 13 - Example of MMA's Pure Contingency Fee Contract) (Fry, Megan)
January 27, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Fortson Fry on behalf of James M. McClenny, McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, John Z. Moseley, Adam T. Walton (Fry, Megan)
January 27, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Chase Branning on behalf of James M. McClenny, McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, John Z. Moseley, Adam T. Walton (Branning, Jeremy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 39 RETURN OF SERVICE of #26 Order served 1/27/22 as to Adam T. Walton. (tot)
January 27, 2022 Filing 38 RETURN OF SERVICE of #26 Order served 1/27/22 as to John Z. Moseley. (tot)
January 27, 2022 Filing 37 RETURN OF SERVICE of #26 Order served 1/27/22 as to James M. McClenny. (tot)
January 27, 2022 Filing 36 RETURN OF SERVICE of #26 Order served 1/27/22 as to McClenny Mosley & Associates, PLLC. (tot)
January 26, 2022 Filing 35 Funds Received for Bond (TRO) in the amount of $1,500.00; Receipt No. 46031057768. (tot)
January 26, 2022 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to James M. McClenny, McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, John Z. Moseley, Adam T. Walton. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, Plf's #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & #27 MOTION to Reconsider are GRANTED as set out. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 District Judge Terry F. Moorer. Plf shall be required to post bond in the amount of $1,5000.00. Plf's #19 MOTION for Expedited Discovery is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. The Clerk is to send copies of this Order by both regular mail & electronic mail as to the parties set out. Plf's counsel is to email copies of this Order to individuals listed in Doc. #24 . Virtual Conference previously scheduled for 1/28/22 at 10:00 am remains scheduled. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/26/22. (tot)
January 26, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jannea S. Rogers on behalf of Neal Townsend (Rogers, Jannea)
January 26, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Neal Townsend (Jackson, Matthew)
January 26, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Advance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tot)
January 26, 2022 REFERRAL OF #29 Brief filed by Neal Townsend re #27 MOTION to Reconsider #26 Court Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; and #30 Notice of Emailing Supplemental Brief to Defendants to Judge Moorer. (mab)
January 25, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE by Neal Townsend of Emailing Supplemental Brief to Defense Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 Filing 29 Brief filed by Neal Townsend re #27 MOTION to Reconsider #26 Court Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Townsend Declaration)) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Plf's re: #27 MOTION to Reconsider #26 Court Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plf shall file a supplemental brief as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send an electronic copy of this order to the email addresses for Dfts &/or their representatives. The virtual hearing on the TRO request & status conference remains set for 1/28/22. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/25/22. (tot)
January 25, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Reconsider #26 Court Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Email to Counsel re TRO Motion)) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order DENYING without prejudice Plf's #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as set out. The #19 Motion for for Preliminary Injunction & Motion for Early Discovery remain pending & are set for a hearing/status conference on 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Terry F. Moorer. The Clerk is DIRECTED to arrange the virtual hearing/status conference & e-mail the call-in information to Plf's counsel who will in turn send the information to Dfts &/or their counsel/representative. Plf's counsel is also DIRECTED to serve Dfts w/a copy of this Order & also send a copy of the order by electronic means as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order by overnight delivery to Dfts as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/25/22. (copies to Dfts by UPS/Overnight Mail on 1/25/22) (tot) Modified on 1/25/2022 (tot). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2022: #1 UPS Receipts) (tot).
January 25, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Neal Townsend re: #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Expedited Discovery in Advance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Advance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Jackson, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE by Neal Townsend re #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Expedited Discovery in Advance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Advance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Jackson, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 REFERRAL OF #20 Motion for leave to Seal Document, 21 Sealed Document(s); and #22 Motion for Leave to Seal Document, 23 Sealed Document(s) to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 25, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #27 MOTION to Reconsider #26 Court Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 25, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Expedited Discovery in Advance of the Preliminary Injunction Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 24, 2022 Answer due from McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC to #18 Amended Complaint pursuant to FRCP 15(a). (tot)
January 24, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Expedited Discovery in Advance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Townsend Declaration with Exhibits)) (Jackson, Matthew). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Discovery on 1/25/2022 (mab).
January 24, 2022 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, James M McClenny, John Z Moseley, Adam T Walton, filed by Neal Townsend. (Jackson, Matthew)
January 24, 2022 REFERRAL OF #13 MOTION for leave to Seal Document, 14 Sealed Document(s); #15 Evidentiary Material re: 7 Emergency MOTION for Order Requiring Defendant to Provide Client Files to Plaintiff; and #16 MOTION for leave to Seal Document, and 17 Sealed Document(s) to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 24, 2022 REFERRAL OF #12 Supplemental Brief and Evidentiary Material, filed by Neal Townsend re: #7 Emergency MOTION for Order Requiring Defendant to Provide Client Files to Plaintiff to Judge Moorer. (mab)
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 15 Evidentiary Material filed by Neal Townsend re: #7 Emergency MOTION for Order Requiring Defendant to Provide Client Files to Plaintiff . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 20, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 Supplemental Brief and Evidentiary Material, filed by Neal Townsend re: #7 Emergency MOTION for Order Requiring Defendant to Provide Client Files to Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Townsend Declaration with Exhibits) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 20, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Docs. 7, 7-1, 8, and 8-1 served on CT Corporation System (Registered Agent for McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC) on January 19, 2022, filed by Neal Townsend. (Jackson, Matthew)
January 20, 2022 REFERRAL OF #7 Emergency Motion for Order Requiring Defendant to Provide Client Files to Plaintiff; #8 MOTION for leave to Seal Document , 9 Sealed Document(s); and #11 Affidavit of Service to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Order Requiring Defendant to Provide Client Files to Plaintiff filed by Neal Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Townsend Declaration with Exhibits)) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 10, 2022 Answer due from McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, pursuant to FRCP 12(a) - See Doc. #6 . (tot)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on CT Corporation System (Registered Agent for McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC) on January 7, 2022, filed by Neal Townsend. (Jackson, Matthew)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (fz)
January 6, 2022 REFERRAL OF #2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document, and 3 Sealed Document(s) to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Neal C. Townsend (Jackson, Matthew)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Neal C. Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against McClenny, Moseley & Associates, PLLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2933839, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Neal C. Townsend. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/6/2022. (Jackson, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (fz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal C. Townsend
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Townsend
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Represented By: Blake T. Richardson
Represented By: Jannea S. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClenny, Moseley & Associates, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Chase Branning
Represented By: Megan Fortson Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. McClenny
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Chase Branning
Represented By: Megan Fortson Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Chase Branning
Represented By: Megan Fortson Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam T. Walton
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Chase Branning
Represented By: Megan Fortson Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Townsend Law, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Law Offices of Daniel R. Sanders LLC
Represented By: Stephen Marshall Cozart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Daniel R Sanders
Represented By: Stephen Marshall Cozart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?