Wallace v. Louisiana-Pacific Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Wallace
Defendant: Louisiana-Pacific Corporation, Stacey Campbell, Industrial Casey, TSI Inc, Louisiana-Pacific Corporation A Corporation doing business as LP Building Solutions, Stacey Leverne Campbell and Casey Industrial, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00128
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 in Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 REFERRAL OF #29 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
May 16, 2022 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion #18 to Remand filed by Tyler Wallace. (Montgomery, Wyatt)
May 10, 2022 REFERRAL OF #28 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
May 9, 2022 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in Support filed by TSI Inc. (Dunn, William)
May 2, 2022 Filing 27 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #25 filed by Casey Industrial, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
April 29, 2022 Filing 26 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #25 filed by Casey Industrial, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
April 29, 2022 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Casey Industrial, Inc.. (Herndon, John)
April 29, 2022 REFERRAL OF #24 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
April 28, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion #7 To Dismiss filed by Stacey Leverne Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Stacey Campbell) (Stewart, Charles)
April 27, 2022 REFERRAL OF #23 Response in Support of Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
April 26, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Workers' Compensation Claim filed by TSI Inc. (Dunn, William)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tyler Wallace. Responses due by 5/9/2022; Replies due by 5/16/2022; Motion to be taken under submission on 5/17/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 4/25/22. (cmj)
April 22, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Casey Industrial, Inc.. (Herndon, John)
April 20, 2022 REFERRAL OF #17 Notice of Filing Exhibits, #20 Response in Opposition to Motion, #19 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
April 20, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in Support to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
April 19, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tyler Wallace. (Montgomery, Wyatt)
April 19, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Workers' Compensation Claim filed by Tyler Wallace. (Montgomery, Wyatt)
April 19, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in Support filed by Tyler Wallace. (Montgomery, Wyatt)
April 19, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in Support of its Response to Stacey Campbell's Motion to Dismiss & its Motion to Remand by Tyler Wallace (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Tyler Wallace, #2 Exhibit OSHA Statement of Tyler Wallace, #3 Exhibit Photograph of Subject Conveyor Belt) (Montgomery, Wyatt)
April 14, 2022 Filing 16 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #14 filed by TSI Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
April 11, 2022 Filing 15 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #14 filed by TSI Inc (Milling, Bert)
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants TSI Inc, TSI Brasil identifying Other Affiliate TSI Brasil for TSI Inc.. (Dunn, William)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order STAYING #4 Preliminary Scheduling Order pending ruling on motions (docs 5 and 7). A new date will be set, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/8/22. (cmj)
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by Stacey Leverne Campbell (Milling, Bert)
April 8, 2022 Filing 11 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by Stacey Leverne Campbell. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
April 7, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Stacey Leverne Campbell. (Stewart, Charles)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stacey Leverne Campbell. Responses due by 4/21/2022; Replies due by 4/28/2022; Motion to be taken under submission on 4/29/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 4/7/22. (cmj)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Stacey Leverne Campbell. (Stewart, Charles) Modified on 4/7/2022 (cmj).
April 7, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stacey Leverne Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Stewart, Charles)
April 7, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #5 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Workers' Compensation Claim filed by TSI Inc. Responses due by 4/19/2022; Replies due by 4/26/2022; Motion to be taken under submission on 4/27/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 4/5/22. (cmj)
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Sever and, MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Workers' Compensation Claim filed by TSI Inc. (Dunn, William)
April 1, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Workers' Compensation Claim to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/13/2022.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by TSI Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A consent) (Dunn, William)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by TSI Inc. (Dunn, William)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2984192, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by TSI Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A state court file, #2 Exhibit Ex B Stacey Campbell declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex C Benny Teal declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex D LaPacific consent to removal) (Dunn, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2022: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (fz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Louisiana-Pacific Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Wallace
Represented By: Stewart Leon Howard
Represented By: Wyatt Perry Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana-Pacific Corporation
Represented By: D. Gregory Dunagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Campbell
Represented By: Charles A. Stewart, III
Represented By: Lillie Amilea Hobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSI Inc
Represented By: Adam K. Peck
Represented By: Sanford Graham Hooper
Represented By: William McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana-Pacific Corporation A Corporation doing business as LP Building Solutions
Represented By: D. Gregory Dunagan
Represented By: Jeremy N. Trousdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Leverne Campbell
Represented By: Charles A. Stewart, III
Represented By: Lillie Amilea Hobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Industrial, Inc.
Represented By: John Dearman Herndon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?