Hill v. Sam's West, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Timothy Hill
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc., Synchrony Financial, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00232
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Young, Leilus)
August 15, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Young, Leilus)
August 15, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC to File Answer filed by John Timothy Hill. (Underwood, Earl)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc to File Answer Answer due from Midland Credit Management, Inc. on 9/6/2022. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/15/2022. (khc)
August 15, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC to File Answer and #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
August 15, 2022 Answer due from Midland Credit Management, Inc. on 9/6/2022 pursuant to Endorsed Order 15 granting doc. #14 . (meh)
August 11, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc to File Answer filed by John Timothy Hill. (Underwood, Earl)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 unopposed Motion for Defendant TransUnion to File Answer. Answer due from TransUnion, LLC on 8/26/2022.. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/11/22. (khc)
August 11, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc to File Answer to Judge DuBose. (meh)
August 10, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion for Defendant TransUnion to File Answer filed by John Timothy Hill. (Underwood, Earl)
August 10, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion for Defendant TransUnion to File Answer to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 08/09/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
August 9, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Synchrony Financial, Synchrony Financial identifying Corporate Parent Synchrony Financial for Synchrony Financial.. (Ronderos, Joseph)
August 9, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Synchrony Financial. (Ronderos, Joseph)
July 29, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Timothy Hill. Sam's West, Inc. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Underwood, Earl)
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Timothy Hill. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Underwood, Earl)
July 29, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Timothy Hill. Transunion, LLC served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022 (Underwood, Earl)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Timothy Hill. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Underwood, Earl)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Timothy Hill. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Underwood, Earl)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Timothy Hill. Synchrony Financial served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Underwood, Earl)
June 17, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Synchrony Financial, Transunion, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3027154, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by John Timothy Hill. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (Underwood, Earl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Sam's West, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Timothy Hill
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Financial
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Leilus Jackson Young, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?