Ely v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donavette Ely
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC. and Siculus, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00268
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
2 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. This action is STAYED pending a decision by the JPML. If Defendants have not yet filed their responsive pleadings, they shall do so either as directed by the District Court in MDL No. 3047 if the action is transferred, or if the action is not transferred, within 30 days of the denial of transfer. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/17/2022. (meh)
August 15, 2022 Filing 15 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #14 filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Instagram, LLC., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Siculus, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statement has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
August 9, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. (Butler, M.)
August 9, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Facebook Technologies, LLC, Facebook Holdings, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc. re: #12 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer (Butler, M.)
August 9, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer filed by Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL Transfer Motion, #2 Exhibit B - MDL Panel Briefing Schedule) (Butler, M.)
August 9, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer to Judge DuBose (nah)
July 25, 2022 REFERRAL OF #11 Amended Complaint to Judge Nelson. (meh)
July 23, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donavette Ely. (Richardson, Clinton)
July 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Richardson on behalf of Donavette Ely (Richardson, Clinton)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order re: #1 Complaint filed by Donavette Ely. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file and serve, no later than 8/2/2022, an amended complaint that corrects the deficiencies described herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/19/2022. (meh)
July 18, 2022 Filing 8 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Michael M. Weinkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 7/18/2022. (clr)
July 15, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael M. Weinkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3040961, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Donavette Ely. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E.D.Pa. Certificate of Good Standing) (Weinkowitz, Michael)
July 15, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael M. Weinkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (meh)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 Answer due from Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (meh)
July 6, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donavette Ely. All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
July 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Donavette Ely (Richardson, Clinton)
July 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3034652, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Donavette Ely. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Richardson, Clinton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ely v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donavette Ely
Represented By: Clinton Richardson
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Holdings, LLC
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations, LLC
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments, Inc.
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Technologies, LLC
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, LLC.
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siculus, Inc.
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?