Archibald et al v. City of Creola et al
Plaintiff: Mandy C. Archibald, Charie D. McSwain and Randy W. McSwain
Defendant: City of Creola, Mark Howell, Frank Hammond, William Brannon, City of Satsuma, Clint Harrell, Robert Moore and Christopher Barron
Case Number: 1:2022cv00312
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Howell, City of Creola, Frank Hammond and #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Brannon. Responses due by 10/12/2022; Replies due by 10/19/2022; Motion to be taken under submission on 10/20/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 9/28/22. (cmj)
September 26, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Creola, Frank Hammond, Mark Howell. (Redditt, Mark)
September 26, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Satsuma, Clint Harrell, Robert Moore. (Hunter, Melissa)
September 26, 2022 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Brannon. (Pike, James)
September 26, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Brannon. (Pike, James)
September 26, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charie D. McSwain, Mandy C. Archibald, Randy W. McSwain. Christopher Barron served on 9/14/2022, answer due 10/5/2022 (Satterwhite, Harry)
September 26, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
September 26, 2022 REFERRAL OF #19 Memorandum in Support to Judge to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
September 9, 2022 Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time filed by City of Satsuma, Clint Harrell, Robert Moore. Answers due from City of Satsuma, Clint Harrell, and Robert Moore on 9/26/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 09/09/2022. (jil)
September 8, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time Motion for Extension of Time filed by City of Satsuma, Clint Harrell, Robert Moore. (Hunter, Melissa)
September 8, 2022 Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Answers due from City of Creola, Alabama, Frank Hammond, and Mark Howell on 9/26/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 09/08/2022. (jil)
September 8, 2022 Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . Answer due from William Brannon on 9/26/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 09/08/2022. (jil)
September 8, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Reissued as to Christopher Barron. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been re-issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
September 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (Satterwhite, Harry)
September 8, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Combs Diard on behalf of City of Creola, Frank Hammond, Mark Howell (Diard, Jaclyn)
September 8, 2022 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time filed by City of Creola, Frank Hammond, Mark Howell. (Redditt, Mark)
September 8, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by William Brannon. (Pike, James)
September 8, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time; ref to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa P. Hunter on behalf of City of Satsuma, Clint Harrell, Robert Moore (Hunter, Melissa)
August 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Rutens on behalf of City of Satsuma, Clint Harrell, Robert Moore (Rutens, Andrew)
August 29, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charie D. McSwain, Mandy C. Archibald, Randy W. McSwain. William Brannon served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022; City of Creola served on 8/20/2022, answer due 9/12/2022; City of Satsuma served on 8/24/2022, answer due 9/14/2022; Frank Hammond served on 8/20/2022, answer due 9/12/2022; Clint Harrell served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022; Mark Howell served on 8/20/2022, answer due 9/12/2022; Robert Moore served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022 (Satterwhite, Harry)
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 Service Order entered 8/16/2022. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 9/26/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 8/16/22. (cmj)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Christopher Barron, William Brannon, City of Creola, City of Satsuma, Frank Hammond, Clint Harrell, Mark Howell, Robert Moore. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (Satterwhite, Harry)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number BALSDC-3054657, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Archibald Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Archibald Complaint) (Satterwhite, Harry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2022: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archibald et al v. City of Creola et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy C. Archibald
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charie D. McSwain
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy W. McSwain
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Creola
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Howell
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Hammond
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Brannon
Represented By: James H. Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Satsuma
Represented By: Andrew John Rutens
Represented By: Melissa P. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Harrell
Represented By: Andrew John Rutens
Represented By: Melissa P. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Moore
Represented By: Andrew John Rutens
Represented By: Melissa P. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?