Sumrall v. Cooper T Smith, Corp.
Plaintiff: Pleas Sumrall
Defendant: Cooper T. Smith Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00330
Filed: August 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104 Marine Personal Injury - Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2024, at 9:30 a.m. (Central) before District Judge Terry F. Moorer. Jury Selection set during the month of March 2024. Jury selection is currently set for 3/5/2024, beginning at 8:45 a.m. (Central) ETT up to 4 Days. Discovery cutoff 9/15/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2023. Motions due by 10/13/2023. Position Regarding Settlement due by 9/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Special Requirements for Final Pretrial Conferences) (fz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Scheduling Conference held on 10/19/2022. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (tgw)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 10/19/2022 at 10:00 a.m. (Central) before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/11/2022. (fz) (Main Document 24 replaced on 10/19/2022) (fz).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Heisterhagen, Timothy)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to George P. Vourvoulias, III. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/6/2022. (fz)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION and APPLICATION for George P. Vourvoulias, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3076672, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Pleas Sumrall. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Vourvoulias, George)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #21 MOTION and APPLICATION for George P. Vourvoulias, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Dennis M. O'Bryan. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/8/2022. (fz)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Pleas Sumrall re: #18 MOTION and APPLICATION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (O'Bryan, Dennis)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #19 Notice of Filing Certificate of Good Standing re: #18 MOTION and APPLICATION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Moorer. (mab)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION and APPLICATION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3065582, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Pleas Sumrall. (Attachments: #1 Court's Admitted, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (O'Bryan, Dennis)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION and APPLICATION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer (Note: need Certificate of Good Standing from federal court). (mab)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/26/22. (Attachment: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (tot)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Terry F. Moorer: #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cooper T. Smith Corporation. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (tot)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-01302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Cooper's motion to transfer #12 is GRANTED, and this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama, Southern Division. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 08/19/2022.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE: The telephone scheduling conference previously set on August 24, 2022, at 11:00 a.m., is hereby cancelled to be reset, if necessary, pending the resolution of the #12 motion to dismiss or, in the alternative transfer venue. By Clerk. (clc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Alabama by Cooper T. Smith Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Amy Slay, #3 Notice of Submission)(Heisterhagen, Timothy) Modified text on 8/10/2022 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2022 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cooper T. Smith Corporation (Heisterhagen, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Cooper T. Smith Corporation.Attorney Timothy Alan Heisterhagen added to party Cooper T. Smith Corporation(pty:dft).(Heisterhagen, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Amended Complaint. **Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section "M" and Magistrate (5).** (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cooper T. Smith Corporation filed by Pleas Sumrall.(O'Bryan, Dennis) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Dennis M. O'Bryan. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 05/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dennis M. O'Bryan (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9377628) by Pleas Sumrall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate)(Vourvoulias, George) Modified text on 5/31/2022 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cooper T Smith, Corp. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Document lists counsel Dennis M. O'Bryan, for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this courts Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Any future filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted and will be deemed deficient.** (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cooper T Smith (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9353963) filed by Pleas Sumrall. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)Attorney George P Vourvoulias, III added to party Pleas Sumrall(pty:selreq).(Vourvoulias, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sumrall v. Cooper T Smith, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pleas Sumrall
Represented By: George Vourvoulias, III
Represented By: Dennis Michael O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper T. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Alan Heisterhagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?