Gordon et al v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carolyn Gordon
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00481
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of BP's First Discovery to Plaintiff filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Thomas, Solomon)
January 23, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Solomon Schae Thomas on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Thomas, Solomon)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Alexander J. Blume, as supplemented by Doc. 16. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/23/22. (lto)
December 23, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE by Carolyn Gordon Supplement to Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Blume, Alexander)
December 21, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION and APPLICATION for Alexander J. Blume to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3119744, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Carolyn Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Blume, Alexander)
December 21, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION and APPLICATION for Alexander J. Blume to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Al Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
December 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Randall Little on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Little, Jonathan)
December 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley B. Gilchrist on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Gilchrist, Wesley)
December 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan)
December 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Morrow on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Morrow, William)
December 2, 2022 Filing 10 SECOND OMNIBUS ORDER MODIFYING BELO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/17/21. (cjr)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C et al. (cjr)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Protective Order, #3 Authorization) (cjr)
December 2, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-02357. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 1, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 12/1/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]
November 23, 2022 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]
August 26, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) Modified on 8/29/2022 (gec). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]
July 28, 2022 Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9467742) filed by Carolyn Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Carolyn Gordon(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon et al v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Gordon
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Alexander J Blume, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: William H. Morrow
Represented By: Solomon Schae Thomas
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Jonathan Randall Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Represented By: Jonathan Randall Little
Represented By: Solomon Schae Thomas
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: William H. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?