Twelve Stones, LLC et al v. VMA Mobile, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Twelve Stones, LLC and The Village at Midtown, LLC
Defendant: VMA Mobile, LLC, PEM Real Estate Group, LLC, VMA PB, LLC, PEM Residential, LLC, PEM Payroll, LLC, Paul Mashni and Beggs And Lane
Case Number: 1:2022cv00515
Filed: December 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 REFERRAL OF #19 Reply Brief, to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
February 20, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs The Village at Midtown, LLC, Twelve Stones, LLC re: #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #18 Response in Opposition to Motion Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Remand and in Opposition to Defendants' Responses filed by The Village at Midtown, LLC, Twelve Stones, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. 1) (Milam, Adam)
February 14, 2023 REFERRAL OF #18 Response in Opposition to Motion, #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
February 13, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Beggs And Lane. (Elebash, William)
February 13, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Paul Mashni, PEM Payroll, LLC, PEM Real Estate Group, LLC, PEM Residential, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC, VMA PB, LLC. (Calligas, Louis)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Hearing on #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2023 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/8/23. (cmj)
February 2, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Beggs & Lane filed by The Village at Midtown, LLC, Twelve Stones, LLC. (Milam, Adam)
February 2, 2023 REFERRAL OF #15 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
January 31, 2023 Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 01/31/2023. (jil)
January 31, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Calligas, Louis)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Village at Midtown, LLC, Twelve Stones, LLC. Responses due by 2/13/2023; Replies due by 2/20/2023; Motion to be taken under submission on 2/21/2023.Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 1/30/23. (cmj)
January 30, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
January 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Village at Midtown, LLC, Twelve Stones, LLC. (Milam, Adam)
January 20, 2023 REFERRAL OF #10 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
January 19, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss of the Mashni Defendants filed by The Village at Midtown, LLC, Twelve Stones, LLC. (Milam, Adam)
January 19, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Verified Complaint & Petition against All Defendants, filed by The Village at Midtown, LLC, Twelve Stones, LLC. (Milam, Adam)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Beggs And Lane. Responses due by 2/2/2023; Replies due by 2/9/2023; Motion to be taken under submission on 2/10/2023. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 1/19/23. (cmj)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Beggs And Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Elebash, William)
January 17, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Judge Beaverstock. (cjr)
January 9, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. DeMoss, III on behalf of VMA Mobile, LLC, PEM Real Estate Group, LLC, VMA PB, LLC, PEM Residential, LLC, PEM Payroll, LLC and Paul Mashni (DeMoss, Robert) Modified on 1/9/2023 (fz).
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PEM Payroll, LLC, PEM Residential, LLC, Paul Mashni, PEM Real Estate Group, LLC, VMA PB, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC. Responses due by 1/19/2023; Replies due by 1/26/2023; Motion to be taken under submission on 1/27/2023. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 1/5/23. (cmj)
January 5, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paul Mashni, PEM Payroll, LLC, PEM Real Estate Group, LLC, PEM Residential, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC, VMA PB, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Calligas, Louis)
December 30, 2022 Answers are to be filed pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (cmj)
December 29, 2022 Filing 3 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 filed by PEM Payroll, LLC, PEM Residential, LLC, Paul Mashni, PEM Real Estate Group, LLC, VMA PB, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC (Milling, Bert)
December 29, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Paul Mashni, PEM Payroll, LLC, PEM Real Estate Group, LLC, PEM Residential, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC, VMA PB, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC identifying Corporate Parent VMA Mobile, LLC for PEM Payroll, LLC, PEM Real Estate Group, LLC, PEM Residential, LLC, Paul Mashni, VMA Mobile, LLC, VMA PB, LLC.. (Calligas, Louis)
December 29, 2022 Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. District Judge William H. Steele no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-M after the case number on all future pleadings. (cle)
December 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-3123060, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by VMA PB, LLC, PEM Payroll, LLC, PEM Residential, LLC, Paul Mashni, PEM Real Estate Group, LLC, VMA Mobile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Calligas, Louis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2022: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twelve Stones, LLC et al v. VMA Mobile, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twelve Stones, LLC
Represented By: Adam Matthew Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Village at Midtown, LLC
Represented By: Adam Matthew Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMA Mobile, LLC
Represented By: W. Joseph McCorkle, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Represented By: Robert L. DeMoss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEM Real Estate Group, LLC
Represented By: W. Joseph McCorkle, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Represented By: Robert L. DeMoss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMA PB, LLC
Represented By: W. Joseph McCorkle, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Represented By: Robert L. DeMoss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEM Residential, LLC
Represented By: W. Joseph McCorkle, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Represented By: Robert L. DeMoss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEM Payroll, LLC
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Represented By: W. Joseph McCorkle, Jr.
Represented By: Robert L. DeMoss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Mashni
Represented By: W. Joseph McCorkle, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Represented By: Robert L. DeMoss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beggs And Lane
Represented By: William Lee Elebash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?