Gulledge v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Gulledge
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson International
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 1:2023cv00005
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Aigner S. Kolom on behalf of Linda Gulledge (Kolom, Aigner)
January 27, 2023 Filing 58 Defendant's Oppositions to Plaintiff's #35 Motions in Limine, filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17) (Babington, Joseph)
January 27, 2023 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re: #33 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by Linda Gulledge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Ward, Navan)
January 27, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #29 Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude or Limit Defense Expert Opinion with Memorandum of Support Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 27, 2023 REFERRAL OF #33 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus); and #57 Response to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 27, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #25 Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Certain Plaintiff's Experts; #26 Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Mari Truman; #27 Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Albert H. Burstein, Ph.D., J. Marcus Hollis Ph.D., and Nathaniel Young, M.S. Regarding the Nature and Medical Cause of Plaintiff's Alleged Injuries; and #28 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude or Limit Non-Retained Witness Testimony to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 27, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 27, 2023 REFERRAL OF #38 Response to #26 Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Mari Truman; #39 Response to #27 Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Albert H. Burstein, Ph.D., J. Marcus Hollis Ph.D., and Nathaniel Young, M.S. Regarding the Nature and Medical Cause of Plaintiff's Alleged Injuries; #43 Response to re: #25 Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Certain Plaintiff's Experts; and #45 Response and Objection #29 Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude or Limit Defense Expert Opinion, to Judge Moorer. (mab)
January 27, 2023 REFERRAL OF #58 Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiff's #35 Motions in Limine to Judge Moorer. (mab)
January 27, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #35 Motion in Limine and Memorandum of Law in Support Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 20, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Byrne, III on behalf of Linda Gulledge (Byrne, David)
January 20, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Lampkin, II on behalf of Linda Gulledge (Lampkin, James)
January 20, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Navan Ward, Jr on behalf of Linda Gulledge (Ward, Navan)
January 11, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Daniel Mahoney on behalf of DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Mahoney, Philip)
January 11, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. H. Babington on behalf of DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Babington, Joseph)
January 10, 2023 REFERRAL OF #51 Case Transferred In - District Transfer to Judge Moorer. (tot)
January 6, 2023 Filing 51 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:12-cv-03301. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 30, 2022 Filing 50 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 - Pursuant to Case Management Order #1 [Dkt. 20] and 28 U.S.C 1404, this Court transfers the identified cases to the appropriate United States District Court as identified above. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/30/2022) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Filing 48 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #28 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Motion in Limine. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/30/2022) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of the Special Master's rulings. After reviewing the pleadings on file including the parties' joint status reports [Dkts. 24, 40] and conducting a telephonic hearing on December 29, 2022 [Dkt. 44], the special master recommends transferring this case for further proceedings because this case is in the process of completing discovery and ready to be set for trial; consequently, the case would no longer benefit from inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings before this Court. Further, the special master recommends transferring the case to the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to the recommendation in the parties' joint status report [Dkt. 37]. The following motions are currently pending in this case: Motions to Exclude [Dkts. 25, 26, 27, 28, 29]; Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Dkt. 32]; and Motions in Limine [Dkts. 33, 35]. Because ruling on these motions will directly impact the claims, defenses, and presentation and admissibility of evidence at trial, the special master recommends this Court defer ruling on these motions to permit consideration by the transferee court which will have responsibility for putting the case on trial. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Filing 45 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc re: #29 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR LIMIT DEFENSE EXPERT OPINIONS WITH MEMORANDUM OF SUPPORT (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 44 Administrative Record consisting of REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE HAD ON THURSDAY, DECEMBER 29, 2022 filed by Special Master. (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 43 RESPONSE filed by Linda Gulledge re: #25 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of the Special Master's rulings. By January 3, 2023, the parties are directed to file a joint status report with a list of any filing a party desires to be included in this individual case from the docket of In re: Depuy Orthopaedics 3:11-MD-2244-K pending in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. The joint status report shall provide a single list of requested filings in chronological order identified by docket number and document title. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ELECTRONIC ORDER - Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [Dkt. 15]. On December 2, 2022, the Special Master recommended denial of the motion and no objections have been filed and therefore the motion is DENIED as moot as the special master has already addressed the concerns identified at a previous conference with counsel.. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/28/2022) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 40 Joint STATUS REPORT (Third) filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 39 RESPONSE filed by Linda Gulledge re: #27 (Document Restricted) MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF ALBERT H. BURSTEIN, PH.D., J. MARCUS HOLLIS, PH.D. AND NATHANIEL YOUNG, M.S. REGARDING THE NATURE AND MEDICAL CAUSE OF PLAINTIFFS ALLEGED INJURIES (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 38 RESPONSE filed by Linda Gulledge re: #26 (Document Restricted) MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF MARI TRUMAN (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 37 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR MOTION IN LIMINE re #35 MOTION in Limine AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Linda Gulledge (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 21, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION in Limine AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Linda Gulledge with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 21, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of hearing. On December 2, 2022, the parties were directed to file a joint status report by December 16, 2022. By 5:00 p.m. Central on December 27, 2022, the parties are directed to file an updated joint status report. The parties are directed to attend a telephonic status conference on December 29, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Central using the following information: Call in number 800.977.8002; Passcode 8325765#. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 21, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Linda Gulledge with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of amendment to correct technical error in the original docket entry. The original complaint [Dkt. 1] was direct-filed in the Northern District of Texas pursuant to this Court's Case Management Order #1 in MDL 2244 [Dkt. 20]. By December 22, 2022, the parties are directed to file a joint status report with the Court providing their recommendations on a court of appropriate jurisdiction for trial pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. [Dkt. 20, *paragraph* 17]. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of the special mater's rulings. The original complaint [Dkt. 1] was direct-filed in the Northern District of Texas pursuant to this Court's Case Management Order #1 in MDL 2244 [Dkt. 20]. By December 22, 2022, the parties are directed to file a joint status report with the Court providing their recommendations on a court of appropriate jurisdiction for trial pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. [Dkt. 20, 17]. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR LIMIT DEFENSE EXPERT OPINIONS WITH MEMORANDUM OF SUPPORT filed by Linda Gulledge with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION PLANTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR LIMIT NON-RETAINED WITNESS TESTIMONY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Linda Gulledge with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 15, 2022 Filing 27 (Document Restricted) MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF ALBERT H. BURSTEIN, PH.D., J. MARCUS HOLLIS, PH.D. AND NATHANIEL YOUNG, M.S. REGARDING THE NATURE AND MEDICAL CAUSE OF PLAINTIFFS ALLEGED INJURIES (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits Part 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits Part 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits Part 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits Part 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits Part 5, #6 Proposed Order) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 15, 2022 Filing 26 (Document Restricted) MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF MARI TRUMAN (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 15, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John H Beisner added to party DePuy Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John H Beisner added to party DePuy Orthopaedics Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John H Beisner added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney John H Beisner added to party Johnson & Johnson International (pty:dft), Attorney John H Beisner added to party Johnson & Johnson Services Inc(pty:dft) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of the Special Master's rulings: Pursuant to the special master's report of December 1, 2022 [Dkt. 22], and the Court's Scheduling Order of September 16, 2022 [Dkt. 14], the parties are directed to confer and file, by December 9, 2022, a joint status report regarding any matters that require the Court's attention to comply with the Court's Scheduling Order. The Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [Dkt. 15] should be DENIED as moot as the special master has already addressed the concerns identified at a previous conference with counsel. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 1, 2022 Filing 22 SPECIAL MASTER'S STATUS REPORT - Presently there are eighty-two cases remaining in this MDL. Sixty-six of the remaining cases are on a scheduling order where all pre-trial filings will be complete by December 30, 2022; twelve of the cases are on a scheduling order with pre-trial filings complete by March 3, 2023; and, four cases are subject to dismissal if service is not quickly accomplished. Although over half of the remaining cases in the MDL have efficiently moved forward on the scheduling order, a select few cases have required significant attention through motions practice and some parties stated inability to meet the Court's deadlines. Many of the issues raised in the motions were resolved through hearings or through agreement. In the previous 45 days, I have conducted numerous formal and informal status conferences. The transcripts and docket entry from those conferences are attached and are being docketed in all cases remaining in the MDL because they could affect outstanding legal and factual disputes among the parties in any of the cases. (Attachments: #1 10-18-2022 Conference Transcript, #2 10-19-2022 Conference Transcript, #3 10-23-2022 Conference Transcript, #4 10-28-2022 Conference Transcript, #5 Docket Entry 1283, #6 11-16-2022 Conference Transcript) (Stanton, James M.) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 21 On November 3, 2022, the special master conducted a discovery conference with Austin Mehr, counsel for plaintiff in Coblin - 3:18-cv-00524-K and Hill - 3:14-cv-03694-K, and Matthew Morrison, counsel for plaintiff in Ellison - 3:12-cv-2498-K, as well as Terri Bruksch, counsel for defendants, regarding the deposition of Dr. Al Burstein. Counsel reached an agreement that Dr. Burstein could be available for deposition in Sarasota, Florida on December 13 and 14, 2022, regarding his opinions in the three cases.Ms. Bruksch informed the special master that Dr. Burstein is also designated as an expert in the following cases: Near - 3:11-cv-01452-K; Ortiz - 3:11-cv-01597-K; Campbell - 3:11-cv-01959-K; Wright - 3:11-cv-02534-K; Brown - 3:11-cv-02574-K; Getz - 3:11-cv-02890-K; Campbell - 3:11-cv-02957-K; Greenwood - 3:11-cv-03585-K; Singer - 3:12-cv-00384-K; Baldwin - 3:12-cv-00731-K; O'Connell - 3:12-cv-01480-K; Gulledge - 3:12-cv-03301-K; Nation - 3:12-cv-03369-K; Taffurelli - 3:12-cv-03371-K; Winkelmeyer - 3:13-cv-01172-K; Jakelis - 3:13-cv-01699-K; Holland - 3:13-cv-02935-K; Jozwiak - 3:14-cv-00365-K; Buonaiuto - 3:14-cv-02750-K; Canty - 3:15-cv-00440-K; Sterling - 3:17-cv-00819-K; Diodato - 3:17-cv-01251-K; Winegarden - 3:18-cv-00159-K; Norvell - 3:18-cv-00381-K; Young - 3:18-cv-00474-K; Fleischman - 3:20-cv-02881-K; Hall - 3:21-cv-01321-K. Counsel for plaintiffs in the additional cases are instructed to coordinate with Mr. Mehr and Mr. Morrison to conduct their questioning, if any, of Dr. Burstein on December 13 and 14, 2022. If agreement cannot be reached, an additional conference with the special master will be conducted. (Stanton, James M.) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Remote Hearing Conference held on 10/19/2022 before James M. Stanton, Court-Ordered Special Master. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amber A Thompson. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Remote Hearing Conference held on 10/18/2022 before James M. Stanton, Court-Ordered Special Master. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael D O'Connor. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
October 25, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc re: #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
October 12, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
October 12, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
October 11, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Linda Gulledge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b), the Court enters this Scheduling Order: 1. Each Plaintiff shall amend pleadings by September 30, 2022; Each Defendant shall amend pleadings by October 14, 2022. 2. Each Plaintiff shall provide expert designations, materials, and reports required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by October 28, 2022; the deposition of each Plaintiff expert shall be conducted between November 7, 2022, and November 18, 2022. 3. Each Defendant shall provide expert designations, materials, and reports required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by November 4, 2002; the deposition of each Defendant expert shall be conducted between November 21, 2022 and December 2, 2022. 4. All discovery shall be completed by December 9, 2022. 5. All dispositive motions or Daubert motions shall be filed by December 16, 2022; and any response to the motions shall be filed by December 30, 2022. 6. The parties shall file motions in limine as well as any motions seeking to limit the testimony of any witness at trial for any reason by December 21, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/16/2022) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying ALL Joint Motion(s) to Stay CMO 12 Obligations in these cases. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/16/2022) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay CMO 12 OBLIGATIONS TO DECEMBER 1, 2022 filed by Linda Gulledge (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
March 15, 2022 Filing 11 Pursuant to the Court's Case Management Order No. 13 [Doc. 1150], the Court-appointed Special Master and Mediator requested that counsel for Plaintiff provide the most convenient city for Plaintiff to attend in-person mediation following an unsuccessful mediation Zoom mediation. The Parties have provided a city. The Mediator has confirmed the location and will provide a date, and the mediation will occur on or before May 31, 2022. (James M. Stanton - Special Master.) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay CMO 12 OBLIGATIONS TO MAY 26, 2022 filed by Linda Gulledge (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay CMO 12 Obligations to April 11, 2022 filed by Linda Gulledge (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO STAY CMO 12 OBLIGATIONS TO MARCH 1, 2022 filed by Linda Gulledge. (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Joint to Stay CMO 12 Deadlines to October 25, 2021. The Parties and DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report on November 1, 2021, regarding the Status of this Case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/23/2021) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay CMO 12 Obligations to October 25, 2021 filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of filing Case Management OrdersThe following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below.#CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 # PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM# CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 # DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET. (lrl) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
September 7, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Michael Roberts, Michael V Powell on behalf of DePuy and Johnson & Johnson defendants (gr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
September 7, 2012 [TEXT ONLY}Addition to NOTICE of Attorney Appearance previously filed this date, adding Jessica D Miller on behalf of DePuy Inc and Johnson & Johnson defendants. No new document attached. (gr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
August 24, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Ed Kinkeade per Amended SO 3-250. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to the case. (plp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED FILING filed by Linda Gulledge (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linda Gulledge. (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. filed by Linda Gulledge. Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the #Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 0539-4778603) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/6/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulledge v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gulledge
Represented By: Melissa Ann Prickett
Represented By: Navan Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Aigner S. Kolom
Represented By: David B. Byrne, III
Represented By: James W. Lampkin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Inc
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?