Graceland Properties, LLC v. MCS Portable Buildings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Graceland Properties, LLC
Defendant: MCS Portable Buildings, LLC, Storage Pro Holdings, LLC, Shannon McDonald, BBD Engineering & Design Firm, LLC and Kent Bice
Case Number: 1:2023cv00013
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant BBD Engineering & Design Firm, LLC. (Crunk, Michelle)
March 10, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BBD Engineering & Design Firm, LLC, Kent Bice. (Crunk, Michelle)
March 6, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Graceland Properties, LLC. (Calamusa, Jane Margaret)
February 14, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Storage Pro Holdings, LLC, Katelyn Shea McDonald, Shannon E. McDonald, Shannon Kyle McDonald, Tonya McDonald identifying Other Affiliate Shannon E. McDonald, Other Affiliate Tonya McDonald, Other Affiliate Katelyn Shea McDonald, Other Affiliate Shannon Kyle McDonald for Storage Pro Holdings, LLC.. (Shreve, Lewis)
February 14, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Shannon McDonald. (Shreve, Lewis)
February 14, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants MCS Portable Buildings, LLC, Shannon E. McDonald, Tonya McDonald identifying Other Affiliate Shannon E. McDonald, Other Affiliate Tonya McDonald for MCS Portable Buildings, LLC.. (Shreve, Lewis)
February 13, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Graceland Properties, LLC by Shannon McDonald, Storage Pro Holdings, LLC, MCS Portable Buildings, LLC. (Shreve, Lewis)
February 10, 2023 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time for BBD Engineering and Kent Bice to Respond to Complaint by Graceland Properties, LLC. (Calamusa, Jane Margaret)
February 3, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graceland Properties, LLC. BBD Engineering & Design Firm, LLC served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/10/2023 (Calamusa, Jane Margaret)
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graceland Properties, LLC. Kent Bice served on 1/27/2023, answer due 2/17/2023 (Calamusa, Jane Margaret)
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graceland Properties, LLC. MCS Portable Buildings, LLC served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023 (Calamusa, Jane Margaret)
February 3, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graceland Properties, LLC. Shannon McDonald served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023 (Calamusa, Jane Margaret)
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graceland Properties, LLC. Storage Pro Holdings, LLC served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023 (Calamusa, Jane Margaret)
January 17, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Graceland Properties, LLC (Calamusa, Jane Margaret)
January 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Graceland Properties, LLC re #1 Complaint - AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet (Calamusa, Jane Margaret)
January 11, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
January 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3129910, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Graceland Properties, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/10/2023. (Calamusa, Jane Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graceland Properties, LLC v. MCS Portable Buildings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graceland Properties, LLC
Represented By: Jane Margaret Laird Calamusa
Represented By: Chandler Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCS Portable Buildings, LLC
Represented By: Lewis Robert Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Storage Pro Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lewis Robert Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon McDonald
Represented By: Lewis Robert Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBD Engineering & Design Firm, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Leigh Crunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Bice
Represented By: Michelle Leigh Crunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?