Pieczonka v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jaroslaw Pieczonka
Defendant: United States of America, Sealift, Inc. and Meridian Global Consulting, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00045
Filed: February 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2023 Filing 43 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-21950. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and/or Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
January 30, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE by Meridian Global Consulting, LLC. re #29 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal AND/OR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Skipp, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (mdc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 2/26/2024 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 2/21/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 12/13/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 11/20/2023.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
December 14, 2022 Filing 38 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Sealift, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Joint Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B- Election to Magistrate)(Gutierrez, Annalisa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by Sealift, Inc.. (Gutierrez, Annalisa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal , #29 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal AND/OR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by Jaroslaw Pieczonka. Replies due by 12/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Finklehoffe, Carol) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before December 14, 2022, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/30/2022. (mja) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER dismissing case without prejudice as to Defendant United States of America ("United States") in light of #33 Plaintiff's Notice of Partial Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Only as to Defendant United States of America. Any pending motions as to Defendant United States are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/29/2022. (mja) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
November 28, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to United States of America Only by Jaroslaw Pieczonka (Finklehoffe, Carol) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE ON DEFAULT PROCEDURE. Plaintiff effectuated service of the summons and complaint on Defendant United States of America ("United States") on July 6, 2022. [ECF No. 18]. Defendant United States, however, has failed to plead or otherwise defend this action after being served with process. Accordingly, within five (5) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file for entry of default by the Clerk as to the defendant. Within ten (10) days of entry of default by the Clerk, Plaintiff shall file a motion for final default judgment, accompanied by a proposed final default judgment attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and duly supported by affidavits and other documentation. Plaintiffs failure to file a Motion for Final Default Judgment on or before the date set forth above may result in dismissal of the instant action. Plaintiff shall immediately provide Defendant with a copy of this Order via certified mail. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/23/2022. (mja) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
November 21, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE by Meridian Global Consulting, LLC. re #29 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal AND/OR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE of Filing Corrected Exhibit in Support of Motion Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Liszt, Craig) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
November 18, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Sealift, Inc.. Responses due by 12/2/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration)(Gutierrez, Annalisa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
November 18, 2022 Filing 29 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal AND/OR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Meridian Global Consulting, LLC.. Attorney Craig Patrick Liszt added to party Meridian Global Consulting, LLC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/2/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Liszt, Craig) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
October 25, 2022 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Meridian Global Consulting, LLC. response/answer due 11/18/2022; Sealift, Inc. response/answer due 11/18/2022. Per DE 28 Order. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #27 Defendants, Meridian Global Consulting, LLC, and Sealift, Inc.'s Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file their responses on or before November 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/25/2022. (mja) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
October 25, 2022 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Meridian Global Consulting, LLC., Sealift, Inc.. Attorney Annalisa Gutierrez added to party Meridian Global Consulting, LLC.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Annalisa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Defendant Sealift, Inc.'s Unopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file its response on or before October 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/12/2022. (mja) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
October 12, 2022 Filing 25 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Sealift, Inc.. Responses due by 10/26/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Annalisa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
October 12, 2022 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Sealift, Inc. response/answer due 10/28/2022. Per DE 26 Order. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant #23 Meridian's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file its response on or before October 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/11/2022. (mja) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
October 11, 2022 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Meridian Global Consulting, LLC. response/answer due 10/28/2022. Per DE 24 Order. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
October 10, 2022 Filing 23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Meridian Global Consulting, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Skipp, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Defendant Sealift, Inc.'s Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file its response on or before October 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/27/2022. (mja) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time response to Amended Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Sealift, Inc.. Responses due by 10/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Annalisa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 22, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jaroslaw Pieczonka. Meridian Global Consulting, LLC. served on 8/24/2022, response/answer due 10/14/2022. (Finklehoffe, Carol) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant United States and Plaintiff Pieczonka's #18 Second Joint Motion to Extend Time for the United States to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The United States shall file its response on or before October 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/19/2022. (mja) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 19, 2022 Reset Response/Answer Due Deadlines per DE#17 & 19: Meridian Global Consulting, LLC. response/answer due 10/14/2022; United States of America response/answer due 10/21/2022. (scn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keast, Sarah) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant's #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file its response on or before October 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/16/2022. (mja) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Meridian Global Consulting, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Skipp, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan William Skipp on behalf of Meridian Global Consulting, LLC.. Attorney Jonathan William Skipp added to party Meridian Global Consulting, LLC.(pty:dft). (Skipp, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant's #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file his response on or before September 30, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/14/2022. (mja) Modified text per chambers on 9/14/2022 (mf). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 14, 2022 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #12 Summons Returned Executed, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by Sealift, Inc.. Attorney Annalisa Gutierrez added to party Sealift, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Sealift's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint)(Gutierrez, Annalisa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
September 1, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jaroslaw Pieczonka. Sealift, Inc. served on 8/26/2022, response/answer due 9/16/2022. (Finklehoffe, Carol) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
August 30, 2022 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: United States of America response/answer due 9/19/2022. Per DE 11 Order. (ebz) Modified text on 8/31/2022 (ebz). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the parties #10 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint on or before September 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/30/2022. (mja) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
August 29, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by United States of America. Attorney Sarah Keast added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Keast, Sarah) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
August 17, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United States of America (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
August 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by Jaroslaw Pieczonka (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Finklehoffe, Carol) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
August 16, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Meridian Global Consulting, LLC.. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
August 16, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sealift, Inc.. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
August 15, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SEALIFT, INC, MERIDIAN GLOBAL CONSULTING, LLC, filed by JAROSLAW PIECZONKA. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(Finklehoffe, Carol) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
June 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 6/27/2022. (ed00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
June 27, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney. (pc) Modified text on 6/27/2022 (pc). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
June 24, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]
June 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (SEAMAN'S) against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Filing fees $ 402.00. Pursuant to 28 U.S. Code 1916 - Filing Fees - Waived, filed by JAROSLAW PIECZONKA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Finklehoffe, Carol) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/1/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pieczonka v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaroslaw Pieczonka
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Represented By: Carol Lynn Finklehoffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah Keast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealift, Inc.
Represented By: Annalisa Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Global Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Annalisa Gutierrez
Represented By: Jonathan William Skipp
Represented By: Craig Patrick Liszt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?